Langston v. Finn et al
Plaintiff: Walter S Langston
Defendant: - Finn, Cater, Beverly Swanson, Kevin - Jones, Marcia George, J L Brown and Ruanne Dozier
Case Number: 2:2008cv02475
Filed: October 17, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Alicemarie H. Stotler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Edward F. Shea on 4/30/2013 DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, the third amended complaint 33 ; This dismissal counts as a "strike" for purposes of Sec 1915(g). The Clerk's Office is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of all Defendants and to CLOSE this file. IT IS SO ORDERED. The Clerk's Office is directed to enter this Order and to forward a copy to Plaintiff at his last known address. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L)
January 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Edward F. Shea on 1/16/13 DISMISSING WITH PREJUDICE plaintiff's Fiftn and Sixth Claims. The Clerk's office is DIRECTED to terminate defendants Ruanne Dozier and Michael Virga as parties to this action. As to hi s remaining claims, plaintiff is GRANTED leave to submit an amended complaint or to voluntarily dismiss his complaint within 60 days of the date of this Order; if he fails to do either, the Court will dismiss the Second Amended Complaint with prejudice, direct the Clerk to enter a Section 1915(g) strike against plaintiff, and close this file. (Meuleman, A)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Edward F. Shea on 7/30/2012 GRANTING 26 Request to File Amendment, construed as Motion to Amend the Complaint; ORDERING Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint within 60 days; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve a copy of this order on the California Department of Corrections. (Michel, G)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by District Judge Edward F. Shea on 5/29/2012. Plaintiff Walter Shane Langston shall submit a status update within 30 days of entry of this Order stating whether he intends to pursue the claims asserted in the 4 First Amended Complaint. (Marciel, M)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Edward F. Shea on 1/21/10 ORDERING pltf's Motions for Reconsideration 18 19 are GRANTED; judgment against pltf 16 is VACATED; the District Court Executive is DIRECTED to reopen the file and is also directed to serve a copy of this order on the CA Dept of Corrections, Legal Affairs, PO Box 942883, Sacramento, CA 94283-0001 to forward the appropriate agency having custody of pltf. (Carlos, K)
January 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FIRST INFORMATIONAL ORDER IN PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS CASE signed by District Judge Edward F. Shea on 1/13/09. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langston v. Finn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter S Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Swanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin - Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcia George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J L Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruanne Dozier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?