Travelers Casualty and Surety Co. v. Natoma Valley Ridge, et al.,

Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Defendant: Natoma Valley Ridge, LLC, GSJ Company, LLC, Grant Avenue, LLC, Creekside 18, LLC, Jeremy A. Dunmore, Sidney D. Dunmore, Ruth Dunmore, Chady Evette Dunmore, Thomas E. Martin, Diane Carol Martin, Stephen K. Parkinson, Susan C. Parkinson, Western Sierra National Bank, Western Sierra Bancorp, Umpqua Bank and Umpqua Holdings Corporation
Case Number: 2:2008cv02715
Filed: November 12, 2008
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Contract: Other Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Referring Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 12:1730 Collection Under Contract Guaranty

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 24, 2012 213 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/21/2012 ORDERING that Judgment be entered in favor of Plaintiff Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America against Defendants Thomas E. Martin, Thomas E. Martin as trustee for the Thomas E. Martin Trust dated December 26, 2002, and GV Investments, LLC, jointly and severally, in the amount of One Hundred Thousand Dollars and Zero Cents ($100,000.00); ORDERING the interest on the principal judgment shall accrue at the Federal rate pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1961 from the date of recordation of the abstract judgment; ORDERING that the settling defendants shall take nothing from Plaintiff. Thomas E. Martin, Thomas E. Martin as trustee for the Thomas E. Martin Trust dated December 26, 2002, and GV Investments, LLC TERMINATED. (Michel, G)
December 30, 2011 205 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/30/2011 ORDERING 204 Defendants Western Sierra Bancorp, Western Sierra National Bank, Umpqua Bank and Umpqua Holdings Corporation are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. (Reader, L)
April 21, 2011 200 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/20/11 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to randomly refer this case to another district judge for any further proceedings that may be appropriate or required. All dates set in the above-entitled action before the undersigned are hereby vacated. (the new case number is 2:08-cv-02715 JAM KJN) (Becknal, R)
November 19, 2010 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/18/10: Plaintiff's motion for sanctions 159 shall be held in abeyance in light of the automatic stay effectuated by defendant Thomas E. Martin's bankruptcy filing, and will dropped from this court's law and motion calendar. (Kaminski, H)
June 25, 2010 153 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AN ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/24/10 ORDERING that the hearing on Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment which is currently scheduled for 7/21/10 132 is VACATED. This order is without prejudice to Plaintiff's right to file another Motion for Summary Judgment against Western Sierra National Bank, Western Sierra Bancorp, Umpqua Holdings Corporation or Umpqua Bank. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 17, 2010 149 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 05/17/10. Motion for Summary Judgment Hearing re-set for 7/21/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez.(Williams, D) Modified on 5/17/2010 (Williams, D).
February 26, 2010 143 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/25/2010 ORDERING 142 Motion for Summary Judgment 132 Hearing reset for 5/5/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Reader, L)
August 7, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 08/06/09 ORDERING that actions demoninated 08-cv-2715 JAM JFM and 09-cv-2147 WBS GGH be and the same hereby are deemed related. Case 09cv-2147 WBS GGH shall be reassigned to Judge John A Mendez and Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Streeter, J)
July 14, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 7/14/09: The July 16, 2009 hearing before the undersigned is vacated. Defendants' June 15, 2009 motion to set aside the clerks entry of default is granted 104 . The Clerk of the Court is dire cted to vacate the April 20, 2009 clerk's entry of default. Within ten days from the date of this order, defendants Jeremy A. Dunmore, Sidney D. Dunmore, GSJ Company, LLC, and Natoma Valley Ridge, LLC, shall file an answer to the second amended complaint. Plaintiff's May 21, 2009 motion for entry of default judgment is denied without prejudice 83 . (Kaminski, H)
February 9, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/6/2009 36 ORDERING that the time for defendants Stephen K. Parkinson and Susan C. Parkinson to respond to the complaint shall be EXTENDED up to and including 2/16/2009. (Reader, L)
January 7, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court TEMPORARY PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 01/07/09 ORDERING that Defendants are prohibited from transferring the property subject to attachment under Code of Civil Procedure section 487.010. IT IS ORDERED that this order shall be p ersonally served on all Defendants pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 486.080. A hearing on Plaintiff's application for right to attach order and order for issuance of writ of attachment shall be held on 1/28/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Plaintiffs shall be provided notice pursuant to California Code of Civil Procedure Section 484.040. (Streeter, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travelers Casualty and Surety Co. v. Natoma Valley Ridge, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Nicholas A Merrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natoma Valley Ridge, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GSJ Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant Avenue, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creekside 18, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy A. Dunmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney D. Dunmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Dunmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chady Evette Dunmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas E. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Carol Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen K. Parkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan C. Parkinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Sierra National Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Sierra Bancorp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umpqua Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Umpqua Holdings Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?