Western Surety Company v. Auto America, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Western Surety Company
Defendant: Auto America, Inc., Moctezuma Tovar, Peneeleyu Tovar, Wachovia Dealer Services, Inc., Truck City Auto Sales, Inc., Fireside Bank, Lobel Financial Corporation, Yolo Federal Credit Union and California Department of Motor Vehicles
Case Number: 2:2008cv02718
Filed: November 12, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Other Statutory Actions Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 STIPULATION for JUDGMENT and ORDER THERETO signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 09/29/10 ORDERING judgment entered accordingly pursuant to parties' 61 Stipulation.(Williams, D)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 57 STIPULATION and ORDER 56 releasing funds and for dismissal signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/22/2010. Clerk shall disburse balance of Bond now deposited with Court as follows: 1) $12,347.50 payable to Western Surety Company; 2) � 36;5,048.00 to CA Department of Motor Vehicles; 3) $3,200.00 payable to Alicia Zapata; 4) $4,057.84 payable to Fireside Bank; 5) $5,028.16 payable to Wachovia Dealer Services; 6) $3,263.89 payable to Lobel Financial Corporation; a nd 7) $17,054.61 payable to Truck City Auto Sales, Inc.. Western Surety Company is DISCHARGED from further liability on Dealer Surety Bond #70194010 filed on behalf of Auto America, Inc. and is hereby EXONERATED. Disbursement checks shall be mailed care of each party and upon disbursal, plaintiff's First Cause of Action in Interpleader shall be DISMISSED with prejudice. (cc: Financial Dept.) (Marciel, M)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/2/10 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION 43 is GRANTED. The 4/8/10 hearing date is accordingly vacated. Plaintiff may file a third amended complaint adding Alicia Zapata as a defendant to this matter not later than ten (10) days following the date this order is electronically filed with the Court. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 03/31/10 ORDERING that plf's 43 Motion to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED; the 04/08/10 hearing is VACATED; plf shall file and serve its proposed First Amended Complaint w/i 10 days. (Benson, A.)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 2/22/10, GRANTING pltf's request to appear telephonically for its motion to amend complaint scheduled for April 8, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. in Dept. 7 of the USDC, Eastern District located in Sacramento, CA. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Surety Company v. Auto America, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Western Surety Company
Represented By: John Lyster Fallat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moctezuma Tovar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peneeleyu Tovar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wachovia Dealer Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Truck City Auto Sales, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fireside Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lobel Financial Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolo Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Motor Vehicles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?