Cowens v. County of Yolo et al
Plaintiff: Jerry W Cowens
Defendant: County of Yolo and Yolo County District Attorney
Case Number: 2:2008cv02730
Filed: November 13, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/20/09 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed with prejudice; objections due within 20 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Gaydosh, J)
February 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/5/09 ORDERING that pltf's 16 request for an extension of time is GRANTED; pltf has 30 days beyond the original deadline, or until 3/22/2009, to file an amended cmplt; and there will be no further extensions of time.(Yin, K)
January 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/20/09 ORDERING that plaintiffs request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action to be collected and paid in accordance with this courts order to the Sheriff of Yolo County filed concurrently herewith. The complaint is dismissed for the reasons discussed above, with leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of service of this order.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cowens v. County of Yolo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry W Cowens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Yolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yolo County District Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?