Pfennig et al v. City of Redding et al
Plaintiff: Mathew Pfennig, Robert Beaulieu, Alicia Dumlao, Robert Beaulieu, III and Joseph Beaulieu
Defendant: City of Redding, Redding Police Department, Leonard F Moty, Bounpon Kongkeviman, Bart Langley, Jonathon Sheldon, Allan Mellon, Brian A. Moore, Chris Smyrnos, Rex Berry, Ryan Ellis and Mike Wood
Case Number: 2:2008cv02740
Filed: November 14, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge:
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/17/10 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 54 is GRANTED. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 06/30/10 ORDERING that atty Gregory W. Winters' 40 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney of Record for plf Matthew Pfenning is GRANTED. (Benson, A.)
December 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/2/2009 RECOMMENDING that dft's 21 Motion to Compel be granted; claims of pltfs Robert Beaulieu, Jr. and Alicia Dumlao and the minor children Robert Beaulieu III an d Joseph Beaulieu by and through their guardians ad litem Robert Beaulieu Jr. and Alicia Dumlao be dismissed without prejudice; objections due within 14 days. Motion Hearing on 12/9/2009 vacated. Referred to Judge (JAM) 21 Motion for Sanctions. (Suttles, J)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/30/09 ORDERING the hearing date of 11/4/09 on dfts motion 25 is continued to 12/9/09 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 25; pltfs SHALL SHOW CAUSE, in writing, no later than 11/18/ 09, why sanctions should not be imposed for failure to timely file a response to dfts motion; pltfs shall file an opposition to the motion, or a statement of non-opposition thereto, no later than 11/18/09; failure of plaintiffs to file an opposition will be deemed a statement of non-opposition to the pending motion, and may result in the granting of dfts motion and/or the imposition of sanctions, including a recommendation of dismissal, as requested by dfts; dfts may file a reply in support of the motion on or before 11/25/set for 12/9/2009 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (EFB) before Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan. (Carlos, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pfennig et al v. City of Redding et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mathew Pfennig
Represented By: Gregory Warren Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Beaulieu
Represented By: Gregory Warren Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Dumlao
Represented By: Gregory Warren Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Beaulieu, III
Represented By: Gregory Warren Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Beaulieu
Represented By: Gregory Warren Winters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Redding
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redding Police Department
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard F Moty
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bounpon Kongkeviman
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bart Langley
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathon Sheldon
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allan Mellon
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian A. Moore
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Smyrnos
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rex Berry
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Ellis
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Wood
Represented By: Gary Charles Brickwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?