Daniel v. Oaks et al
Plaintiff: Melvin De Van Daniel
Defendant: B. Oaks, Dennis Smallie, Molther, Garcia, M. Howard and Bonnett
Case Number: 2:2008cv02920
Filed: December 2, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/14/10, ORDERING that the court's December 11, 2009 order to show cause 26 is DISCHARGED; and the court will not order dft Molthen or Lt. Montes to pay the costs of service of process.(Kastilahn, A)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/10/09 ORDERING that within 14 days from the date of this order defendant Montes shall pay tothe United States Marshal the sum of $104.50, unless within that time defendant files a written statement showing good cause for his failure to waive service. The court does not intend to extend this 14 day period. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the U.S. Marshal. (cc US Marshal)(Dillon, M)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/26/09 ORDERING discovery to be completed by 5/20/10; dispositive motions, other than discovery motions, to be noticed to be heard on or before 8/26/10; pltf's designation of expert witnesses due on or before 10/14/10, dft's designation of expert witnesses due on or before 11/18/10; pretrial conference set for 4/18/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Judge William B. Shubb; and the court trial is set for 6/14/11 at 2:00 pm before Judge William B. Shubb. (Carlos, K)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/18/09 ORDERING that the parties shall submit to the court and serve by mail on all other parties, no later than September 28, 2009, a status report as directed by this order. (Duong, D)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/15/09 ORDERING the plaintiff to provide an additional three endorsed filed copies of the amended complaint filed 3/16/09 within 20 days. (Gaydosh, J)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/1/09 ORDERING that the Clerk send pltf three USM-285 forms, one summons, an instr sheet and a copy of the amd cmp filed 3/16/09. Within 30 days from the date of this order, pltf shall complete the attached Notice of Submission of Documents and submit the completed Notice to the court with the required documents. (Kastilahn, A)
January 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 01/22/09 ORDERING that plf's 2 IFP Application is GRANTED; plf's 1 Complaint is DISMISSED w/ 30 days leave to amend; Clerk to send plf civil rights complaint form. (Benson, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel v. Oaks et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melvin De Van Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Oaks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Smallie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Molther
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonnett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?