Lor v. Felker
Petitioner: Yong Lor
Respondent: Tom Felker
Case Number: 2:2008cv02985
Filed: December 8, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 08/05/16 ordering on 6/06/16, petitioner filed a document entitled "Ex Parte Motion for an order allowing petitioner to file an amended habeas application 116 . This filing does not appear to be contemplated by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or the Federal Rules governing 2254 cases. Therefor, petitioner's motion will be placed in the court file and disregarded. (Plummer, M)
May 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 100 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/16/13 recommending that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
December 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/5/2012 VACATING the 1/16/2013 evidentiary hearing and RESETTING it for 1/28/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Yin, K)
December 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/5/12 ORDERING that the December 17, 2012 evidentiary hearing is vacated and is reset for January 16, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned magistrate judge in courtroom #27. (Dillon, M)
November 8, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting 86 EX PARTE APPLICATION for the issuance of subpoena and payment of witness fees signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/8/12. (Kaminski, H)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/5/2012 ORDERING the Clerk to return the 10/1/2012 letter received from an inmate other than plaintiff to the sender. (Letter returned to non-party J. Kor along with order)(Yin, K) Modified on 10/5/2012 (Yin, K).
August 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/03/12 ordering ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 10/5/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd.) The evidentiary hearing will be limited to 1) the receipt of testimo ny from petitioner's trial counsel regarding the issues described by the court at the 01/06/11 hearing on petitioner's motion for an evidentiary hearing; and 2) the receipt of any other evidence relevant to the disposition of the issues raised by the pending petition as discussed in this court's 05/07/12 order. (Plummer, M)
July 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 7/31/2012 ORDERING 72 that, upon reconsideration, the order of the magistrate judge 71 is AFFIRMED. (Reader, L)
May 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/25/2012 ORDERING that the 6/20/12 evidentiary hearing is VACATED; an evidentiary hearing will be reset, if appropriate, after respondent's 5/17/12 request for reconsideration is ruled upon.(Yin, K)
May 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/04/12 ORDERING ( Evidentiary Hearing set for 6/20/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd.) The evidentiary hearing will be limited to: 1) the receipt of testim ony from petitioner's trial counsel regarding the issues described by the court at 01/06/11 hearing on petitioner's motion for an evidentiary hearing; and 2) the receipt of any other evidence relevant to the disposition of the issues raised by the pending petition as discussed above. (Plummer, M)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 04/06/11 ordering that within 21 days from the date of this order, the parties shall simultaneously file their briefs addressing the impact of Cullen v. Pinholster on petitioner's 10/29/10 request for an evidentiary hearing. (Plummer, M)
March 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/30/2011 re 55 ORDERING that upon reconsideration, the order of the 52 magistrate judge filed January 10, 2011 is AFFIRMED. (Duong, D)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/07/11 granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion for Discovery. An evidentiary hearing is set for 03/07/11 at 9:00 a.m. in courtroom 27. The evidentiary hearing is limited to: (1) the receip t of testimony from petitioner's trial counsel regarding the issues generally described by the undersigned at the 1/06/11 hearing; and (2) the receipt of any other relevant evidence pertaining to those generally described issues that may be obtained by petitioner in advance of the hearing as a result of independent investigation. (Plummer, M) Modified on 1/10/2011 (Plummer, M).
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/08/10 ordering petitioner's motion for discovery and/or for evidentiary hearing is to be filed by 10/29/10. Respondent shall file an opposition to petitioner's motion by 12/03/10. Petitioner may file a reply, if any, by 12/17/10. A hearing on petitioner's motion will be held on 01/07/11 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 27.(Plummer, M)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/27/10 ordering ( Status Conference set for 10/8/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DAD) before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd.) Petitioner shall file a status conference report at least 1 week prior to the hearing, setting forth his position on the appropriate way to proceed in this matter with respect to discovery, briefing schedule and the need for an evidentiary hearing. Respondent shall file a status conference report no later than 10-06/10 addressing the same issues. (Plummer, M)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/27/10 ORDERING that the Federal Defender is appointed and is directed to locate appropriate counsel available to accept the appointment on behalf of petitioner. Clerk of the Court is directed to ser ve a copy of the petition and this order on Carolyn Wiggin, Assistant Federal Defender. Petitioners counsel shall contact the Clerks Office to make arrangements for copies of documents in the file. Status Conference set for 8/27/2010 at 10:00 AM in C ourtroom 27 before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Seven days prior to the status conference the parties shall file and serve status reports addressing any matters they believe appropriate to the prompt and just disposition of this action.(Dillon, M)
January 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/12/09 DENYING 7 Request for appointment of counsel.(Dillon, M)
January 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/7/09 ORDERING that petitioners application to proceed IFP is GRANTED; Respondent is directed to file a response to petitioners habeas petition within 60 days from the date of this order. The Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order, a copy of the petition for writ of habeas corpus, and a copy of the form regarding consent or request for reassignment on Michael Farrell. (cc Michael Farrell)(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lor v. Felker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yong Lor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tom Felker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?