Pearson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jimmy L. Pearson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2008cv03042
Filed: December 15, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:416 Denial of Social Security Benefits

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER settling attorney's fees signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/06/10. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/30/10 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for Summary Judgment or Remand 20 is GRANTED. The Commissioner's Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment 22 is DENIED. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/16/2009 GRANTING 18 Stipulation and Proposed Order extending time to file a summary judgment to 11/12/2009. (Matson, R)
July 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 7/22/2009 GRANTING 16 Stipulation and Proposed Order extending pltf's time to file memorandum in support of summary judgment to 10/12/2009. (Matson, R)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/12/2009 GRANTING 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS filed by Jimmy L. Pearson; The Clerk is directed to serve the scheduling order in social security cases; The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM; and w/in 15 days the pltf shall submit the appropriate paperwork to the USM. (cc USM)(Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pearson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy L. Pearson
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?