Miller v. Perez et al
Plaintiff: Ernest Miller
Defendant: T. Perez, C. Lockard, J. Lawry and Robinson
Case Number: 2:2008cv03101
Filed: December 22, 2008
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/2/2010 DENYING pltf's 27 motion to proceed IFP on appeal. (cc: Ninth Circuit)(Yin, K)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 04/21/10 ordering that plaintiff's 03/29/10 notice of motion objection 22 , construed as a motion for relief from judgment under Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(b) is denied. (Plummer, M)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 2/22/2010 ORDERING that pltf's IFP status is hereby REVOKED and he is barred from proceeding IFP under 28 USC 1915(g),and the 4/9/09 order is VACATED to the extent it permitted pltf to pay t he civil filing fee pursuant to the installment payment provisions; pltf's defective 18 motion for preliminary injunctive relief is DENIED; and this case is DISMISSED w/prejudice for pltf's repeated failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. CASE CLOSED. (cc: CDC, Financial) (Yin, K)
September 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 09/10/09 ordering that the amended complaint is dismissed with 1 further opportunity for plaintiff to amend in the form of a second amended complaint within 30 days. (Plummer, M)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 [VACATED AS TO IFP PURSUANT TO 19 ORDER] ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/8/2009 ORDERING that the application to proceed IFP is GRANTED; pltf is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 in accordance with concurrent order; the equal protection claim as to all defts is DISMISSED with leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days. (Gaydosh, J) Modified on 2/22/2010 (Yin, K).
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/5/09 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperis on the form provided by the Clerk of Court, or the appropriate filing fee. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Lockard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lawry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?