Seefeldt v. California Forensic Medical Group et al
Plaintiff: Brian S. Seefeldt
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group, R Kadavari, Tom Norris, Karina Purcell and James Lewis
Case Number: 2:2008cv03123
Filed: December 23, 2008
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/15/2010 GRANTING defendants' 74 Motion to Dismiss. This matter is DISMISSED without prejudice for failure to prosecute pursuant to FRCP 41(b).. (Marciel, M)
September 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 09/23/10 ordering that plaintiff shall show cause on or before 10/28/10 why sanctions should not be imposed, up to and including dismissal of this action, for his failure to appear at the second scheduled deposition. (Plummer, M)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/9/2010 GRANTING dfts' 70 motion for expenses; and pltf to pay expenses in the amt of $525.00 to dfts. (Yin, K)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 07/20/10 ordering defendants' 07/13/10 motion to compel and motion for sanctions 70 is granted in part. The discovery deadline is extended to 08/20/10 only to the extent it is necessary for defendants to depose plaintiff. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing on or before 08/04/10 why sanctions should not be imposed for his failure to appear at the scheduled 07/12/10 deposition. (Plummer, M)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 5/18/2010 ORDERING that pltf's 68 motion is GRANTED; the 11/12/09 stay is LIFTED and the clerk shall reopen this action; discovery is EXTENDED to 7/20/2010; all pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, due on or before 10/20/10; and in all other respects, the 8/28/09 scheduling order remains in effect. (Yin, K)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/11/09 ORDERING that 58 Motion to Stay is GRANTED; Plaintiff's 51 and 52 Motions are DENIED without prejudice to their renewal once the stay is lifted. This action is stayed for six months. The 11/30/09 discovery deadline is extended to two months after the stay is lifted. The 2/1/10 pretrial motions deadline is extended to five months after the stay is lifted.(Dillon, M)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/13/09 ORDERING that 47 Motion to compel discover is DENIED without prejudice, 48 Motion is DENIED. (Dillon, M)
September 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 09/08/09 denying 24 Motion for TRO and denying 38 Motion for sanctions. (Plummer, M)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER AND DISCOVERY AND SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 08/27/09 ordering plaintiff's 08/19/09 motion to lift stay 35 is granted; the 04/17/09 stay is lifted and the clerk of the court is directed to reopen this a ction. Defendants Norris and Stanton shall file their answer within 20 days from the date of this order. Plaintiff's 08/24/09 motion for hearing date 39 is denied. Plaintiff's 08/24/09 motion for sanctions 38 shall be briefed pursuan t to Local Rule 78-230(m); the motion will then stand submitted on the papers. Plaintiff's 08/24/09 motion to change current calendars dates is partially granted. The parties shall conduct discovery until 11/30/09. All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before 02/01/10. (Plummer, M)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 32 Motion to be moved to federal custody signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 07/09/09. (Plummer, M)
April 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/16/09 GRANTING 21 Motion to Stay; pltf shall file a report advising the status of his recovery within 60 days from the surgery date. (Gaydosh, J)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/13/09 ORDERING that plaintiff's request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED; Plaintiff is obligated to pay the filing fee of $350.00 for this action to be collected and paid in accordance with this courts order to the Sheriff of Solano County filed concurrently herewith. Service is appropriate for the following defendants: Solano County Sheriff, Dr. Kadavari, Tom Norris, RN Karina Purcell and RN James Lewis. The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff five USM-285 forms, one summons, an instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint filed 12/23/08, to be completed and returned with Notice of Submission of documents within 30 days.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seefeldt v. California Forensic Medical Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian S. Seefeldt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Forensic Medical Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Kadavari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Norris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karina Purcell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?