Turner v. Sacramento County Jail
Plaintiff: Lafonzo R. Turner
Defendant: Sacramento County Jail
Case Number: 2:2009cv00117
Filed: January 14, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Prisoner: Civil Rights Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER denying 119 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/10/11. (Plummer, M)
July 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/07/11 denying 112 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/9/11 DENYING 106 Motion to Strike. Plaintiff's 105 Filings are DISREGARDED as untimely-filed. It is hereby RECOMMENDED that 88 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted and this action be dismissed with prejudice. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. Motion referred to Judge William B. Shubb. (Donati, J)
February 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/03/11 ordering plaintiff's 11/01/10 motion 82 is denied. Plaintiff's request for additional time to pursue discovery 84 is denied. Plaintiff's 12/01/10 motion for extension of time to file an opposition to the motion for summary judgment 84 is granted. Plaintiff's12/17/10 opposition 94 and 01/18/11 declaration 97 are deemed timely filed. Defendants reply to plaintiff's opposition, if any, shall be filed 7 days from the date of this order. At that time, the motion for summary judgment will stand submitted. (Plummer, M)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 01/12/11 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to change plaintiff's address to his present address reflected in his 12/17/10 filing 94 , in Lancaster, California and to re-serve a copy of the 12/15/10 order 92 on plaintiff at his current address. (Plummer, M)
December 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/17/2010 ADOPTING 80 Findings and Recommendations in full. Pltf's 79 motion for injunctive relief concerning access to legal materials is DENIED without prejudice. (Zignago, K.)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 12/14/10 DENYING Pltf's 87 Motion for Reconsideration. (Owen, K)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/14/10 ORDERING that counsel for defendants shall forthwith contact the Litigation Coordinator at Lancaster State Prison and obtain declarations addressing the following: Plaintiffs 79 and [82 ] motions for access to his legal materials; Correctional Officer Davenports note, set forth above; and Plaintiffs access to his legal materials, if any, from May 11, 2010, to the present. Thirty days from the date of this order counsel for defendants shall file a response to plaintiffs 79 and 82 motions, including the pertinent declarations.(Dillon, M)
October 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/21/10 ORDERING that Plaintiffs 74 motion to amend is denied. Plaintiffs 74 request for appointment of counsel is denied. Plaintiffs 77 motion to add exhibit is granted.(Dillon, M)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/24/10 ORDERING that plaintiffs 73 motion for the appointment of counsel is denied; Plaintiffs 72 motion for extension of time is denied; Plaintiffs 72 motion regarding legal property is denied without prejudice. (Dillon, M)
June 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER adopting 60 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL and denying 46 Motion, 51 Motion, 52 Motion, 55 Motion and 56 Motion. Plaintiff's motion for production of documents is denied without prejudice signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 6/23/10. (Kaminski, H)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 05/26/10 ordering plaintiff's 05/21/10 motion 63 is stricken. Plaintiff's 05/21/10 request for appointment of counsel 62 is denied. Plaintiff's May 2010 request for copies and the attached correspondence concerning discovery 64 is disregarded. (Plummer, M)
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/11/10 ORDERING that 53 Motion to Compel is DENIED without prejudice; RECOMMENDING that motions for injunctive relief concerning access to legal materials or ac cess to the prison law library 46 , 51 and 52 be denied without prejudice; Plaintiffs motions for injunctive relief concerning medical or mental health treatment at California State Prison--L.A. County 55 and 56 be denied without prejudice. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER adopting 43 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 3/31/10: 25 , 28 Defendants' motions to dismiss are denied. Defendants are directed to answer the amended complaint within twenty days from the date of this order. (Kaminski, H)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/23/10 ORDERING that 39 Motion to Amend the Complaint is DENIED without prejudice; RECOMMENDING that 25 and 28 MOTIONS to DISMISS be denied; and Defendants be directed to answer the amended complaint within twenty days from the date of any order by the district court adopting these findings and recommendations. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 02/08/10 denying Motions for return of legal property 33 , 38 . Within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a response to the 11/23/09 order. (Plummer, M)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/23/09 ORDERING that w/in 14 days, pltf to file a short declaration addressing whether the 5/16/05, excessive force incident in the original cmplt is different from the 1/19/05, excessive force incident discussed in the amended cmplt.(Yin, K)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 01/28/09 ORDERING that the request to proceed IFP is GRANTED; pltf is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 with an initial partial fee of $10.45 to be paid and collected in accordance with this court's order to the CDC filed concurrently herewith; the complaint is DISMISSED with leave to file an amended complaint within 30 days. (Manzer, C)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE. Case transferred to EDCA.. Signed by Judge Claudia Wilken on 1/13/09. (scc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009) [Transferred from cand on 1/14/2009.]
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Sacramento County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafonzo R. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?