Hernandez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Anastacio Hernandez, Jr.
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2009cv00272
Filed: January 30, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Defendant
Jury Demanded By: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/28/10: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is denied 20 . The Commissioner's cross-motion for summary judgment is granted 22 . The Clerk of Court enter judgment in favor of the Commissioner. (Kaminski, H)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/31/2009 ORDERING 12 that Defendant shall have an extension of time of 29 days, up to and including 8/28/2009, to answer Plaintiff's complaint. (Reader, L)
February 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/5/2009 ORDERING 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS is GRANTED; the Clerk is directed to serve the scheduling order; the Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM; w/in 15 days from the date of this order, pltf shall submit appropriate paperwork to the USM; and the USM is directed to serve all process w/out prepayment of costs not later than 60 days. (cc USM) (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anastacio Hernandez, Jr.
Represented By: Ann M. Cerney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?