Luu v. Institution Classification Committee et al
Petitioner: Quoc Xuong Luu
Respondent: Institution Classification Committee, D K Sisto and CA Dept of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Case Number: 2:2009cv00338
Filed: February 5, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 02/08/11 recommending that petitioner's ex parte motion for summary judgment 19 be denied. Petitioner's motion to renew ex parte motion for summary judgment 22 be denied. Respondents' motion to dismiss 21 be granted. The clerk be directed to close the case. MOTIONS 19 , 21 , 22 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/10/10 ordering within 14 days of the date of this order, respondents shall mail another copy of the motion to dismiss to petitioner at his current address. Within 40 days of the date of this order, petitioner shall file an opposition or a statement of no opposition to the motion to dismiss. (Plummer, M)
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/30/10 ORDERING that within twenty-one days of the date of this order, petitioner shall file either an opposition to the motion to dismiss or a statement of no opposition. (Dillon, M)
June 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/21/10 DENYING 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel without prejudice. (Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Luu v. Institution Classification Committee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Quoc Xuong Luu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Institution Classification Committee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: D K Sisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: CA Dept of Corrections and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?