United States of America v. Elmer et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Bradley J Elmer, Chris J Elmer, Ryan Elmer, Michael Boehrer, Jeffrey Delany and Associated Tax Planners, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2009cv00430
Filed: February 13, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Taxes Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 26:7401 IRS: Tax Liability

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATED ORDER FOR PERMANENT INJUNCTION signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/27/10. CASE CLOSED. (Manzer, C)
July 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/8/2010 re 40 ORDERING that the parties' Joint Pre-Trial Statement shall be due September 24, 2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2010 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Court Trial set for 11/8/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Duong, D)
April 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 04/21/10 ORDERING that, pursuant to 38 Stipulation, the 32 Scheduling Order is AMENDED as follows: joint pretrial statement is due 08/04/10; Final Pretrial Conference set for 08/11/10 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez and Court Trial set for 09/13/10 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A.)
January 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/21/10 ORDERING that the Scheduling Order entered on April 15, 2009 32 is modified as follows: (1) Rebuttal expert disclosures under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(2)(c) are to be completed on or before January 29, 2010; and (2) Discovery must be completed on or before March 31, 2010. All other dates, duties, and rules expressed in the original Scheduling Order 32 remain the same. (Becknal, R)
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/15/09 ORDERING that Designation of Expert Witnesses ddl 12/31/2009; Discovery ddl 2/28/2010; Dispositive Motion ddl 3/24/2010. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/28/2010 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Bench Trial set for 6/28/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Duong, D)
April 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER RE: PERMANENT INJUNCTION signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 04/02/09. See order for details. (Benson, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Elmer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Brian H Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley J Elmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris J Elmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Elmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Boehrer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Delany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Tax Planners, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?