Coalition for a Sustainable Delta et al v. City of Stockton et al
Plaintiff: Coalition for a Sustainable Delta, Belridge Water Storage District, Berrenda Mesa Water District, Cawelo Water District, North of the River Municipal Water District, Wheeler Ridge-Maricopa Water Storage District and Dee Dillon
Defendant: City of Stockton and County of San Joaquin
Case Number: 2:2009cv00466
Filed: February 18, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Environmental Matters Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 33:1319 Clean Water Act

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER re retention of jurisdiction to enforce terms of the settlement agreement signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 9/17/15. (Kaminski, H)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 97 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 4/2/2012 ORDERING 96 the Status Conference scheduled for 4/20/2012 is VACATED; Status Conference Reset for 8/22/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez; no further request for stay will be granted. (Reader, L)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/3/12 ORDERING a status report will be submitted on or before March 30, 2012, informing the Court of the status of settlement negotiations, whether or not the Parties would like the Court's assistance in mediation, and, if necessary, propose a discovery and trial schedule in the event settlement negotiations have not proceeded satisfactorily.The status conference scheduled for February 21, 2012 is vacated. A status conference will be held on April 2 0, 2012, to further inform the Court of the Parties progress towards final settlement. In the event settlement negotiations have not proceeded satisfactorily, such time shall be used to determine dates for mediation, if appropriate, and set discovery and trial dates. (Becknal, R)
August 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/22/2011 re 90 ORDERING that a status report will be submitted on or before October 31, 2011, informing the Court of the status of the Assessment. A status conference will be held on February 21, 2012, to further inform the Court of the Parties' progress towards final settlement. (Duong, D)
February 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 02/22/11 ORDERING that all proceedings in this action are STAYED; all dates set in the 87 Stipulation and Order are VACATED; the parties shall file a status report by 08/17/11 to inform the Court of the progress towards final settlement. (Benson, A.)
August 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 87 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/16/2010 GRANTING 86 Stipulation and Proposed Order; Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off: April 15, 2011; Expert Disclosures: June 15, 2011; Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: July 15, 2011; Completion of All Discovery: August 26, 2011; Deadline to File Dispositive Motions: November 11, 2011; Dispositive Motion Hearing Deadline: January 11, 2012 at 9:30 a.m.; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2012 at 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 4/9/2012 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Matson, R)
December 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/30/2009 DENYING dft's 64 Motion for Reconsideration. (Suttles, J)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/2/09 modifying 56 Amended Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 9/2/2010. Discovery due by 10/4/2010. Dispositive Motions due by 1/26/2011. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/15/2011 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Jury Trial set for 5/23/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Owen, K)
October 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 69 THIRD STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/28/09 EXTENDING the deadline for OMI/Thames to file and serve its response to the Third Party Claim to 01/04/10.(Benson, A.)
August 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 8/20/09 ORDERING dfts' Motion to Dismiss 37 is DENIED; dfts' answer to the complaint shall be filed on or before 9/9/09. (Carlos, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Coalition for a Sustainable Delta et al v. City of Stockton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coalition for a Sustainable Delta
Represented By: Joshua A. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belridge Water Storage District
Represented By: Joshua A. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berrenda Mesa Water District
Represented By: Joshua A. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cawelo Water District
Represented By: Joshua A. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North of the River Municipal Water District
Represented By: Joshua A. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wheeler Ridge-Maricopa Water Storage District
Represented By: Joshua A. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dee Dillon
Represented By: Joshua A. Bloom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Stockton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Joaquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?