June 25, 2013 |
Filing
199
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/24/2013 RECOMMENDING that 197 Request for Dismissal be granted; RECOMMENDING that 170 , 177 , 178 Motions for Summary Judgment and Summary Adjudication be denied as moot; RECOMMEDNING that the Clerk of Court be directed to close this case and acate all future dates. Referred to Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Michel, G)
|
March 12, 2013 |
Filing
195
ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 3/11/13 ORDERING that plaintiff's successor or representative shall file a motiont for substitution within 90 days; the Clerk shall serve a copy of this order upon plaintiff's address of record as well as upon plaintiff's brother. (Manzer, C)
|
February 12, 2013 |
Filing
191
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/12/13 ORDERING that within seven days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall show cause in writing why she should not be sanctioned for failure to timely comply with court ord ers, local rules, and the rules of litigation procedure. Plaintiff's failure to timely respond to this Order to Show Cause may serve as an additional ground for a potential recommendation that this case be dismissed pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). The parties are informed that, regardless of whether plaintiff timely responds to this Order to Show Cause, the hearings on the pending motions for summary judgment shall proceed as scheduled on 2/21/2013. (Kastilahn, A)
|
October 24, 2012 |
Filing
169
ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/24/12 ORDERING any evidentiary or procedural motions are to be filed by May 23, 2013. Oppositions must be filed by May 30, 2013 and anyreply must be filed by June 6, 2013. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/13/2013 at 02:00 PM and Jury Trial set for 8/5/2013 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. All other due dates set forth in the Court's Pretrial Scheduling Order are confirmed.(Matson, R)
|
October 17, 2012 |
Filing
168
STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/16/2012 ORDERING 167 that pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1) defendants Sonja Jackson, M.D. and David Fakhiri, M.D. are hereby DISMISSED with prejudice, for a waiver of fees and costs. (Reader, L)
|
September 21, 2012 |
Filing
166
ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/20/12: Defendant AMERICAN MEDICAL RESPONSE dismissed with prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
|
September 18, 2012 |
Filing
165
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/18/12 DISMISSING American Medical Response from this action with prejudice. (Meuleman, A)
|
June 22, 2011 |
Filing
151
ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 6/22/2011 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS 138 are ADOPTED; Defendants Sacramento County Mental Health Treatment Center, Dorian Kittrell and Frank Patino are DISMISSED from this action with prejudice. (Reader, L)
|
June 2, 2011 |
Filing
148
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/1/2011 ORDERING that the 134 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. (Duong, D)
|
May 23, 2011 |
Filing
138
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/19/2011 RECOMMENDING that pursuant to the 5/4/11 order and all parties stipulation, dfts Sacramento County/SCMHT, Dorian Kittrell, and Frank Patino be dismissed from this action w/ prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
May 20, 2011 |
Filing
134
ORDER AND ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/19/2011 ORDERING Plaintiff must file a written statement under penalty of perjury detailing the circumstances preventing her from filing a status report prior to the day before the conference; pltf must file this written statement within 7 days of the entry of this order; all parties, including pltf, must each file completed "Consent to /Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge" forms within 7 days of the entry of this order.(Reader, L)
|
May 4, 2011 |
Filing
128
ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 5/3/11 ORDERING the findings and recommendations 121 ADOPTED; The motion to dismiss the claim for violation of 42 U.S.C. § 1981 is GRANTED as to dft American Medical Response (AMR), and that cla im is DISMISSED with prejudice as against AMR; the motion to dismiss the claim for violation of 18 U.S.C. § 245 is GRANTED as to AMR, and that claim is DISMISSED with prejudice as against AMR; the motion to dismiss the claims for violations of C alifornia Civil Code §§ 51 and 51.7 are GRANTED as to AMR, and that the claims are DISMISSED with prejudice as against AMR; the motion to dismiss the claims for violations of California Civil Code §§ 54, 54.1, and 54.3 is GRANTED as to AMR, and that the claims are DISMISSED with prejudice as against AMR; the motion to dismiss the claims for violation of California Civil Code § 1708 are GRANTED as to AMR, and that the claims are DISMISSED with prejudice as against AMR; th e motion to dismiss the trespass claim is GRANTED as to AMR, and that the trespass claim is DISMISSED with prejudice as against AMR; the motion to dismiss the false imprisonment and false arrest claims are GRANTED as to AMR, and that the claims are D ISMISSED with prejudice as against AMR; the motion to dismiss the defamation/slander claim is GRANTED as to AMR, and that the claim is DISMISSED with prejudice as against AMR; the motion to dismiss the conversion claim is GRANTED as to AMR, and that the claim is DISMISSED with prejudice as against AMR; the motion to dismiss the medical malpractice claim is GRANTED as to AMR, and that the claim is DISMISSED with prejudice as against AMR; and the motion to dismiss the negligence per se claim is GRANTED as to AMR, and that the claim is DISMISSED with prejudice as against AMR. (Carlos, K)
|
April 5, 2011 |
Filing
123
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/4/11 ORDERING that this matter is now SET for a Status Conference on 5/19/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
March 31, 2011 |
Filing
122
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/31/11 RECOMMENDING that the 72 Motion to Dismiss be granted as to specific claims. 72 Motion to Dismiss is referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Donati, J)
|
January 14, 2011 |
Filing
118
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/13/11 ORDERING the motion for a court order authorizing the release of pltf's psychiatric records 109 GRANTED; the Sacramento County Mental Health Treatment Ctr shall release to the dfts in this case, or their designated counsel, pltf's psychiatric records for the period of November 2006 through the present. (Carlos, K)
|
July 16, 2010 |
Filing
107
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 07/15/10 ORDERING that the 109 OSC is DISCHARGED; plf's previously granted authorization to file documents electronically in this action is REVOKED. Plaintiff shall file any future documents in this case in accordance with the provisions pertaining to pro se plaintiffs; Clerk is directed to REMOVE attorney Robert C. Bowman as an attorney of record and from the docket in this action. (Benson, A.)
|
July 15, 2010 |
Filing
106
ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 7/14/2010. In the interests of judicial economy, Court will VACATED deadline for making Initial Disclosures and filing Joint Status Report. If necessary, a Status Conference will be set after ruling on Motions to Dismiss. (Marciel, M)
|
July 9, 2010 |
Filing
102
ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/8/2010 ORDERING that attorney Robert Bowman is ordered to SHOW CAUSE within 7 days, why he should not be deemed to represent pltf Kathlyn A. Rhodes for all purposes in this action. Mr. Bowman shall also address whether he authorized pltf to use his e-filing name and password for filings in this action. Pltf shall serve a copy of this order upon attorney Robert C. Bowman and file a proof of service with this court reflecting su ch service within 7 days. Pltf is further ordered to SHOW CAUSE within 7 days why she believes that she is permitted to use another attorney's account to file documents in this action. Failure to comply with the terms of this order may result in dismissal of this action. (Zignago, K.)
|
April 29, 2010 |
Filing
67
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/28/10 ORDERING that the Court's 4/12/10 Order to Show Cause 62 is DISCHARGED as to Defendant Thomas J. Platina and he is not required to pay the costs of personal service upon him in this action. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
|
April 13, 2010 |
Filing
62
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/12/2010 ORDERING that within 14 days of the date of service of this order, defendant Thomas J. Platina shall either pay to the United States Marshals Service the sum of $57.20 or, alternat ively, file with the court a written statement showing good cause for failing to waive service. Within 14 days of the date of service of this order, defendant American Medical Response shall either pay to the United States Marshals Service the sum of $68.50 or, alternatively, file with the court a written statement showing good cause for failing to waive service. Payment should be mailed to: U.S. Marshal's Service. (cc: USM) (Duong, D)
|
March 26, 2010 |
Filing
61
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/25/2010 ORDERING that Pltf is GRANTED leave to file a Second Amended Complaint within 30 days. Pursuant to stipulation of the parties, any pending discovery requests are hereby withdrawn. Pltf i s GRANTED leave to file documents in this action via the court's electronic filing system. Dfts' pending motions 24 27 30 are DENIED. All dfts in this action are required to file a responsive pleading or motion within 30 days of the date of Pltf's service of the Second Amended Complaint. (Engbretson, K.)
|
September 15, 2009 |
Filing
5
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/15/09 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to issue forthwith, and the US Marshal is directed to serve within 90 days of the date of this order, all process pursuant to FRCP 4, including a copy of this court's Status Order, without prepayment of costs; The Clerk shall send plaintiff one USM-285 form for each defendant, one summons, a copy of the complaint, an appropriate form for consent to trial by a magistrate judge, and this court 039;s status order; In the event the US Marshal is unable, to effectuate service on any defendant within 90 days from the date of this order, the Marshal is directed to report that fact, and the reasons for it, to the undersigned. The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on the US Marshal, 501 "I" Street, Sacramento, CA 95814, (916) 930-2030. (Becknal, R)
|