Holloway v. Curry
Petitioner: Kevin Louis Holloway
Respondent: Ben Curry
Case Number: 2:2009cv00922
Filed: March 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/9/12 RECOMMENDING that that 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be denied. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Dillon, M)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/14/11 ordering respondent's 03/09/11 request to withdraw his motion to dismiss 29 is granted. Respondent's 11/22/10 motion to dismiss 23 is stricken. Respondent is directed to file an answer to petitioner's habeas petition within 30 days from the date of this order. Petitioner's reply, if any, shall be filed and served within 30 days after service of the answer. (Plummer, M)
January 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/04/11 ordering the clerk of the court is directed to substitute Warden Randy Grounds as the respondent for this action. Petitioner shall show cause within 21 days, why respondent's 11/22/10 motion to dismiss should not be granted. (Plummer, M)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING 14 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS in full signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/17/10 and ORDERING that petitioner's 13 Motion for Stay and Abeyance is DENIED; petitioner's third and fourth claims for relief are DI SMISSED as unexhausted; petitioner's 17 09/13/10 Request for a COA and Request for Appointment of Counsel are DENIED; the Magistrate Judge shall issue an order directing the respondent to file a response to Grounds One and Two of petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus. (Benson, A.)
July 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/26/10 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court is directed to randomly assign this case to a District Judge; and RECOMMENDING that Petitioner's 2/19/10 motion for a stay and abeyance 13 be denied; Petitioner's third and fourth claims for relief be dismissed as unexhausted; and Respondent be ordered to file a response to Grounds One and Two of petitioner's petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr; Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Becknal, R)
January 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/25/10 ORDERING that within 30 days from the service of this order, petitioner shall file his motion for a stay and abeyance as set forth above.(Dillon, M)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/18/09 ORDERING that Petitioner has paid the filing fee; Within 30 days, petitioner shall inform the court how he intends to proceed and file his motion for a stay and abeyance, amended habeas petition or motion to voluntarily dismiss his petition; Petitioner's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice. (Becknal, R)
April 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER, INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER to SACRAMENTO, signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa A. Goldner on 4/2/09: The new case number is 2:09-CV-922 DAD (HC).(Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Louis Holloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ben Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?