Ross v. David et al
Plaintiff: |
Alex K Ross |
Defendant: |
A. David, D. Swingle, S. M. Roche and T Deward |
Case Number: |
2:2009cv00984 |
Filed: |
April 13, 2009 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights Office |
County: |
Lassen |
Presiding Judge: |
Craig M. Kellison |
Presiding Judge: |
Craig M. Kellison |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
Federal Question |
Jury Demanded By: |
42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 31, 2011 |
Filing
62
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/28/11 recommending that defendant David be dismissed from this action for failure to effect timely service and this action be dismissed. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
August 15, 2011 |
Filing
55
ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/13/2011 ORDERING that the 42 findings and recommendations filed February 11, 2011, are adopted. Defendants' 27 motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's 33 motion for summary judgment is DENIED. Judgment shall be entered in favor of the moving defendants. This action shall proceed as to defendant David only.(Duong, D)
|
June 6, 2011 |
Filing
50
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 06/06/11 vacating 46 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Plaintiff's request to attempt re-service on defendant David is granted. The clerk of the court shall send plaintiff 1 USM-285 form for defendant David, 1 summons and instruction sheet. Within 20 days of the date of service of this order, plaintiff shall complete the attached Notice of Submission of Documents and submit it with the completed summons and USM-285 form. (Plummer, M)
|
April 22, 2011 |
Filing
46
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/21/2011 RECOMMENDING that dft David be dismissed from this action for failure to effect timely service. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
|
February 11, 2011 |
Filing
42
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 02/10/11 recommending that defendants' motion for summary judgment 27 be granted. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment 33 be denied. Judgment be entered in favor of defendants; and the clerk of the court be directed to close this case. MOTIONS for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 27 , 33 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
|
February 3, 2011 |
Filing
41
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/2/11 DENYING 22 Motion for Entry of Default against defendant David; Plaintiff shall promptly seek additional information sufficient to effect service on any unserved defendants and notify the court once such information is ascertained. (Dillon, M)
|
September 15, 2010 |
Filing
37
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/14/10 denying 21 Motion for assistance; denying 24 Motion to Appoint Counsel.. (Dillon, M)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?