Camacho v. McDonald

Case Number: 2:2009cv00988
Filed: April 13, 2009
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Habeas Corpus (General) Office
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Referring Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2011 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 10/06/11 ORDERING that petitioner's 32 Motion to waive CR31-1 and Permit Appellant to file Application for Certificate of Appealability and 33 Motion for Certificate of Appealability are DENIED. (Benson, A.)
February 22, 2011 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 2/22/11: Petitioner must file, within 30 days of the date of this order, one of the following: additional briefing re his pending motion to stay or an amended petition. (Kaminski, H)
January 11, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Charlene H. Sorrentino on 1/11/2011 ORDERING that Ptnr shall advise the court, within 30 days, whether he wishes to return to state court or whether he wishes to proceed only on the exhausted portions of his claims. (Zignago, K.)
August 20, 2009 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 08/20/09 ORDERING that petitioner's 17 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED; petitioner shall file a traverse by 09/16/09. (Benson, A.)
July 20, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/17/09 ORDERING that 14 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED; 15 Motion for Extension of time is GRANTED. Petitioner shall file and serve his traverse on or before 8/17/09.(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Camacho v. McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?