Diamond v. Mediterranean Shipping Company, et al,
Plaintiff: Arthur Diamond
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, CSE Insurance Group and Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. Geneva
Case Number: 2:2009cv01110
Filed: April 21, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition For Removal--Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 21, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER ADOPTING 118 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 07/20/2011 DENYING 62 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING 80 Amended Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 104 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; DENYING 113 Motion for Summary Judgment; REMANDING CASE to Sacramento County Superior Court. Copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED. (Michel, G)
May 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 118 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/11/11 RECOMMENDING dft Mediterranean Shipping Co's motion to dismiss 104 be granted; dft State Farm's motion for summary judgment 80 be granted and denied; dft C SE's motion to dismiss 113 be granted and denied; this action be remanded to Sacramento Superior Court and that this action be closed. REFERRED to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; objections due within 21 days after being served with these F&R's. (Carlos, K)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/10/10 ORDERING plf's request for production of documents 94 is DISREGARDED; and the docket entry 94 shall be AMENDED to reflect that the document is a request for production of documents and that it is disregarded. (Carlos, K)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/23/10 ORDERING that Pltf's opposition to Deft State Farm's 62 Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 10/29/10; Deft's reply due by 11/5/10. Upon the filing of Deft's reply, the court will take the motion under submission. (Owen, K)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/26/2010 ORDERING 75 that the amended Findings and Recommendations are ADOPTED in FULL; Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Remand is DENIED; and Defendant 14 State Farm Mutual Automobile Ins. Company's Motion to Dismiss the professional negligence cause of action of pltf's complaint is GRANTED. (Reader, L)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER and AMENDED FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/23/2010 ORDERING that the 58 Findings andRecommendations filed March 31, 2010 (Doc. No. 58) are VACATED. It is recommending that re 14 Motion to Dismiss filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, 18 MOTION to REMAND recommending that plaintiff's 18 5/15/09 motion for remand be denied. Defendant State Farm's 14 motion to dismiss the professional negligence cause of action of plaintiff's complaint be granted.Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Duong, D)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/06/10 ORDERING that w/i 14 days plf shall respond to dft Mediterranean's 60 04/14/10 objections or state in writing that he has no objection to the denial of his Motion for Remand; the 05/28 /10 deadline for law and motion practice is VACATED. That deadline will be re-set if appropriate after plf's pending Motion to Remand and dft State Fram's Motion to Dismiss have been resolved. Dft State Farm's 62 Motion for Summary Judgment will be DROPPED from the court's calendar subject to re-noticing if appropriate following ruling on the Motion for Remand. (Benson, A.)
April 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/1/2010 ORDERING that the objection period was inadvertently omitted from the 58 Findings and Recommendations. Objections to the F&Rs due within 14 days. (Engbretson, K.)
March 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/31/10 RECOMMENDING that: the 18 Motion for Remand be granted and this action be remanded to the Sacramento County Superior Court; State Farm's 14 Motion to Dismiss the professional negligence cause of action of plaintiff's complaint be denied as moot in light of the recommended remand; and that this action be closed. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. (Donati, J)
October 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AMENDED STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/13/09 ORDERING that due to the unavailability of counsel for dft State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company the Jury Trial has been reset to 10/18/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE) before Judge Morrison C. England Jr. No other changes have been made. (Engbretson, K.)
August 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/24/09 ORDERING that Defendant's Motions to Compel were granted in part and the Motion for Sanctions was DENIED. Plaintiff shall supplement his responses within fourteen days of the date of this order.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/27/09 ORDERING that plaintiff's 35 July 6, 2009 motion to reschedule hearing is GRANTED, and the hearing of defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Companys motions 26 29 is CONTINUED from July 31, 2009, to August 14, 2009, at 10:00 a.m. (Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond v. Mediterranean Shipping Company, et al,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur Diamond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSE Insurance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. Geneva
Represented By: Timothy Ross Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?