Allen v. Picciano

Plaintiff: Eugene Allen
Defendant: Constance Picciano
Case Number: 2:2009cv01141
Filed: April 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/20/10 ORDERING the findings and recommendations 22 are ADOPTED IN FULL; pltf's motion for preliminary injunction 24 is DENIED; action DISMISSED for failure to state a claim and the Clerk is directed to close the case. (Carlos, K)
June 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/30/2010 RECOMMENDING that pltf's 12 motion for preliminary injunction be denied; and this action be dismissed w/ prejudice due to pltf's failure to state a claim. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
February 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/25/10 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Eugene Allen to the clerk until the balance of $350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders )(Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen v. Picciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Constance Picciano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?