Sanchez v. Indymac Bank, FSB, et al.
Plaintiff: Donald Sanchez
Defendant: Indymac Bank FSB, Indymac Federal Bank FSB, MTC Financial, Inc., Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc., Windsor Capitol Mortgage Corporation, Linda Temko, Barbara Ciullo, Jeff B McGregor, Ronny Early, First Priority Financial Inc., David Michael Soldati, Thrivest Financial Inc. and Michael Anthony Lipscomb
Case Number: 2:2009cv01186
Filed: April 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 8/31/11 ORDERING that the Court finds that Plaintiff's actions in failing to comply with the Court's repeated instructions are willful and terminating sanctions are appropriate. Terminating sanctions are thus issued against Plaintiff. The Clerk is ordered to close the case. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/15/11 ORDERING Plaintiff to file a Request to Enter Default Judgment within 10 days of this Order being electronically filed. Plaintiff's failure to file the appropriate documents will result i n terminating sanctions, without further notice to the parties, for failure to comply with 82 Hearing. Plaintiffs counsels 83 Declaration and 84 Exhibits are insufficient, and does not satisfy the Courts requirement that Plaintiff file a timely Request for an Entry of Default. (Meuleman, A)
April 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/6/11 ORDERING Intervenor Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation is hereby dismissed from this action WITHOUT prejudice; and Each party to bear their own attorney's fees and costs with respect to said action. (Matson, R)
September 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 09/02/10 ORDERING that Freddie Mac's 67 Motion to Expunge Lis Pendens is GRANTED; plf is directed to pay to dft $1,000.00 which the Court finds is a reasonable fee incurred by dft in expunging the lis pendens. (Benson, A.)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/23/2010 ORDERING that without opposition, Freddie Mac's 59 Motion to Intervene is hereby GRANTED. The Court declines to immediately adopt movant's proposed Motion to Expunge but does grant leave to file said motion by way of regular motion practice as outlined by Local Rules.(Duong, D)
April 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION and ORDER 27 for Dismissal signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/27/2010. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, as Receiver, is DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. Parties being dismissed will bear their own attorney's fees and costs. (Marciel, M)
January 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/15/2010 ORDERING that dfts' 36 Motion to Dismiss pltf's Complaint as alleged against First Priority and David Soldati is GRANTED without leave to amend; dft's First Priority Financial Inc. and David Michael Soldati terminated. (Suttles, J)
August 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/14/09 ORDERING that Dfts' 22 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Pltf may file an amended complaint within 20 days. (Engbretson, K.)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/15/09 ORDERING that Defendant Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc. is DISMISSED from this action without prejudice. The case remains active against other Defendants. Each of the parties will bear its own fees and costs incurred with respect to this action. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Indymac Bank, FSB, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac Bank FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac Federal Bank FSB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MTC Financial, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Windsor Capitol Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Temko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barbara Ciullo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff B McGregor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronny Early
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Priority Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Michael Soldati
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thrivest Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Anthony Lipscomb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Sanchez
Represented By: Michael J. Zinicola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?