Brooks v. Haviland et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Brooks
Defendant: J. W. Haviland, V. Sing, Miles, R. W. Cappel and Herrera
Case Number: 2:2009cv01364
Filed: May 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER AND PROPOSED TRIAL DOCUMENTS signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 5/2/13. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/3/2013 ORDERING the custodian to produce Richard Brinkman #E-19751, to testify in USDC at 9:00 AM on 5/7/2013 in courtroom #10, before Judge G arland E. Burrell, Jr.; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Out-to-Court Desk and CSP-Solano Warden. (cc: OTCD-SAC) (Yin, K)
March 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/27/13 ORDERING the Custodian to produce Ronald Brook at 10:30 am on March 29, 2013 in Courtroom 10 before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. Custodian is ordered to notify the Court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. Copy faxed to Warden, DVI. (cc: OTCD)(Dillon, M)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/28/2013 ORDERING the custodian to produce Ronald Brook #B-73494, to testify in USDC at 1:30 PM on 3/29/2013 in courtroom #10, before Judge Ga rland E. Burrell, Jr.; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Out-to-Court Desk and the Warden of DVI. (cc: OTCD-SAC) (Yin, K)
November 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 11/21/2012 ORDERING that upon reconsideration, the Order of the Magistrate Judge filed 10/29/2012 is AFFIRMED. Defendants are directed to file with the Court the CDCR identification numbers for the eight inmate witnesses listed on p. 7 in the Pretrial Order as soon as practicable, no later than ten weeks before trial, or show good cause why they are unable to do so. (Krueger, M)
October 29, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/29/12 DENYING 98 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
August 17, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/17/2012, GRANTING the parties 30 days to file amended pretrial statements; and DENYING plaintiff's 91 request for appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
June 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/20/12 ordering the custodian to produce Ronald Brook at 07/12/12 at 1:00 p.m. in courtroom 27 before Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: DAD and OTCD)(Plummer, M)
June 4, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 06/04/12 ordering the Custodian to produce Ronald Brook at 07/09/12 at 9:30 a.m. in courtroom 26 before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. Clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian and Out-to-Court Desk. (cc: OTCD)(Plummer, M)
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER denying 78 Motion to Amend the Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 05/29/12. (Plummer, M)
March 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Requesting Confidential Statements re: Case Selection for Prisoner Settlement Program signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/19/12. The parties to this action shall each, no later than 15 days from the date of the order, submit confidential statements. (cc ADR)(Dillon, M)
March 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/16/12 ADOPTING 72 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS IN FULL; Defendants' 48 April 11, 2011 motion for summary judgment is DENIED (Kaminski, H) Modified on 3/19/2012 (Meuleman, A).
January 27, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 01/27/2012 ORDERING Clerk shall correct the caption of this case as to defendant V. Singh; RECOMMENDING 48 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by Miles, R. W. Cappel, V. Sing, Herrera be denied; this matter is referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr; any party may file Objections to F&R within 21 days after being served. (Waggoner, D)
January 26, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 1/25/2012 ORDERING 70 that, upon reconsideration, the order # 69 of the Magistrate Judge filed 1/10/2012, is AFFIRMED. (Reader, L)
January 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/10/12 denying 67 Motion to Amend the Complaint. (Dillon, M)
November 9, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/9/11 DENYING 64 Motion to stop transfer and/or for the appointment of counsel. (Dillon, M)
October 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/7/11 ORDERING 62 Findings and Recommendations are adopted in full; 52 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for TRO is denied. (Matson, R)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K Delaney on 8/18/11: Recommending that 52 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION be denied. 52 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. Objections to F&R due within twentyone days. (Kaminski, H)
August 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/1/2011 re 58 Motion for Reconsideration; ORDERING that, upon reconsideration, 57 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel is AFFIRMED. (Waggoner, D)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/13/11 DENYING 56 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/17/11 RECOMMENDING that 41 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT be denied. Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 21 days.(Dillon, M)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/18/2011 DENYING pltf's 37 motion to compel. (Yin, K)
February 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/9/11 GRANTING 42 Motion for Extension; Defendants' are granted until 4/11/11 to file a motion for summary judgment.(Matson, R)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/21/2010 DENYING pltf's 34 request for a subpoena. (Yin, K)
August 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/6/10 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 7/2/10 26 are ADOPTED in full; Defendants MOTION to Dismiss 18 is DENIED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/1/2010 ORDERING the clerk to assign this case a district judge; and pltf's 23 motion to amend the cmplt is DENIED as unnecessary; and RECOMMENDING that dfts' 18 motion to dismiss be denied. Assigned and Referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; Objections to F&R due w/in 21 days. (Yin, K)
December 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING USM to serve Complaint filed on 5/15/2009, on R. W. Cappel within 10 days signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/9/2009; the Clerk is directed to fwd submission of documents to the USM. (cc: USM) (Suttles, J)
November 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/23/09: Plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel is denied. Plaintiff's request to have the initial partial filing fee recalculated is denied. Plaintiff's request for a n order directing service on defendant Haviland is denied. Plaintiff's request for an order directing service on defendant Cappel is granted; service is appropriate on the retaliation claim only. The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff one USM-285 form, one summons, an instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint filed May 15, 2009. (Kaminski, H)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING USM to serve * Complaint * filed on * 5/15/09,* on * V. Sing, Miles, Herrera*, signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/2/09: The Clerk of the Court shall serve upon plaintiff a copy of Local Rules of Court. (Kaminski, H)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ronald Brook signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/8/09. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee of $128.60 and thereafter the $221.40 balance and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Haviland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. W. Haviland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Sing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. W. Cappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?