Holloman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gary Holloman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2009cv01400
Filed: May 20, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER 26 signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/16/2010 GRANTING 25 Motion for Attorney Fees pursuant to Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA). Plaintiff's counsel is awarded $3900.00 in compensation. (Marciel, M)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/13/10 ORDERING that pltf's 20 Motion for Summary Judgment or Remand is GRANTED; deft's 22 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Case remanded for further proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). CASE CLOSED. (Owen, K)
January 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/5/09: The Plaintiff's time to file the summary judgment in this case is hereby extended from January 4, 2010, to March 9, 2010. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Holloman
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?