Sanchez v. Aviva Life and Annuity Company et al
Plaintiff: Ernest P. Sanchez
Defendant: Aviva Life and Annuity Company, Loomis Wealth Solutions, Inc., Lawrence Leland Loomis, Naras Secured Fund #2, LLC, Lismar Financial Services, LLC and Nationwide Lending Group
Case Number: 2:2009cv01454
Filed: May 27, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/17/11 GRANTING the SEALING of Exhibits A, B 16-28, G, and I 2-16 136 Notice of Request to Seal Document(s) filed by Aviva Life and Annuity Company. Aviva life to send approved sealed documents to the court via email to ApprovedSealed@caed.uscourts.gov. (Donati, J)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/15/2011 re 141 ORDERING that Aviva's Ex Parte Application should be, and hereby is, GRANTED. The deadline to hear dispositive motions shall be extended to July 13, 2011, and Aviva's motions shall be scheduled for hearing on July 13, 2011 at 10:00 a.m.(Duong, D)
May 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/3/11 ORDERING Pltf's motion to shorten time 114 is GRANTED; Pltf's motion to extend discovery cut-off 117 is DENIED; the final pretrial conference is RE-SET to 9/14/11 at 11:00 IN Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; and the trial date is RE-SET from 11/29/11 to 11/28/11 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Carlos, K)
September 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 09/28/10 GRANTING 103 Motion to Dismiss Class Allegations. This action shall proceed against defendants only with respect to plaintiff's individual claims. (Williams, D)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 109 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/2/2010. (Matson, R)
August 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 8/25/10 ORDERING that CIV S.-10-0458 MCE KJN shall not be reassigned.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
June 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 6/28/10 ORDERING that Aviva's MOTION to DISMISS Pliantiff's SAC it its entirety, for failure to adequately allege a conspiracy 87 is DENIED. Aviva's MOTION to DISMISS Plaintiff's first, fifth, and sixth causes of action are DENIED, GRANTED, and DENIED, respectively. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 12/22/2009 ORDERING Pltf's Second Amended Complaint no longer need be filed on or before 12/21/2009; On or before 1/15/2010, Pltf will file and serve a Motion to Dismiss Class Allegations and for Lea ve to File an Amended Complaint (the Motion) which shall be set for hearing on 3/26/2010 or the first available date thereafter if such hearing date is no longer available; and Pltf shall file and serve his Second Amended Complaint 10 days after the Court issues its ruling on the Motion and in accordance with the terms and provisions of such ruling.(Matson, R)
November 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 11/17/09 ORDERING that Aviva's motion to dismiss plaintiff's FAC, as asserted against Aviva 61 is GRANTED in its entirety. Plaintiff is permitted one final opportunity to amend his complaint t o allege facts, if any, to establish Aviva's knowledge of, or participation in, Loomis' Ponzi investment scheme. Said amended pleading shall be filed and served within 20 days of the date of this Order. Aviva shall have 30 days thereafter to file a response thereto. (Becknal, R)
July 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 07/21/09 GRANTING 42 Stipulation. The Joint Status Report currently due on 7/24/09, will now be due 30 days after the ruling on Defendant Aviva'a Motion to Dismiss. (Streeter, J)
July 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 7/16/2009 DENYING 16 plaintiff's motion to remand, in its entirety. (Reader, L)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 7/8/2009 ORDERING 36 Aviva Life and Annuity Company's Application for surreply memorandum, is hereby ACCEPTED for filing. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. Aviva Life and Annuity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ernest P. Sanchez
Represented By: Lawrence Jay Salisbury
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aviva Life and Annuity Company
Represented By: Steven H. Frankel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loomis Wealth Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Leland Loomis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naras Secured Fund #2, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lismar Financial Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Lending Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?