Meyer v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Russell Meyer
Defendant: Christopher Smith, R. Hawkins, C. Lovett, B. Williams and W. Washimoto
Case Number: 2:2009cv01527
Filed: June 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/17/10 granting 33 Motion to Dismiss. CASE CLOSED. (Dillon, M)
November 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/29/10 ordering plaintiff has requested that this action be dismissed. Within 14 days, defendants shall indicate whether they have any objection to plaintiff's request. (Plummer, M)
October 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/01/10 DENYING 30 Motion to Compel. (Williams, D)
July 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/22/10 DENYING 23 and 25 Motions to Compel; Plaintiff is granted 21 days within which to file a motion to compel Stan Schlachter to respond to the subpoena referenced in the July 6, 2010 motion to compel directed to the litigation coordinator at Mule Creek State Prison. (Dillon, M)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING USM to serve process w/in 10 days on dfts S Naseer, Christopher Smith, R. Hawkins and C. Lovett signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/28/09. The clerk is directed to fwd to the USM instructions for service, summons, copies of the cmplt and this order. The clerk shall also send pltf a copy of the Local Rules. (cc: USM) (Yin, K)
November 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kevin Russell Meyer signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/24/09. CDC is to collect monthly payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meyer v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Russell Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Lovett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W. Washimoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?