(PC) Van Nort v. Dickinson et al
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Van Nort
Defendant: Kathleen L. Dickinson, Greg Block, Dug Traub and Vicky Flandi
Case Number: 2:2009cv01566
Filed: June 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Garland E Burrell
Referring Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 7, 2011. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 7, 2011 Filing 40 JUDGMENT entered *9/7/2011* pursuant to #39 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations. (Marciel, M)
September 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING #37 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, in full, signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 9/5/2011. Defendants' #17 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims for injuntive relief, damages, and state law claims are DISMISSED. Clerk shall CLOSE this file. (Marciel, M)
September 7, 2011 SERVICE BY MAIL: #39 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations and #40 Judgment served on plaintiff Charles E. Van Nort. (Marciel, M)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii: Due to the recent appointment of Magistrate Judge Carolyn K Delaney to the bench of the Eastern District, this action is REASSIGNED from Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman for all further proceedings. (Waggoner, D)
August 3, 2011 SERVICE BY MAIL: #38 Order Reassigning Magistrate Judge served on Charles E. Van Nort. (Waggoner, D)
July 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 7/14/2011 ORDERING that the Clerk of Court assign a district judge to this case. It is recommending that dfts' #17 motion to dismiss be granted. Plaintiff's claims for injunctive relief under 1983 and the ADA be dismissed as moot. Plaintiff's claims for damages under 1983 and the ADA be dismissed for failure to state a claim on which relief can be granted. Plaintiff's state law claims be dismissed for failure to comply with the California Tort Claims Act. This case be closed. Objections due within twenty-one days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Duong, D)
July 15, 2011 Filing 36 CLERK'S NOTICE: (Text Only) This case has been assigned to US District Judge Garland E. Burrell and to US Magistrate Judge Kendal J. Newman. All future case shall bear the case number as follows: 2:09-cv-1566 GEB KJN P. (Duong, D)
July 15, 2011 SERVICE BY MAIL: 36 Clerk's Notice and #37 Order, Findings and Recommendations served on Charles E. Van Nort. (Duong, D)
June 15, 2011 Filing 34 BRIEF Regarding Mootness of Plaintiff's Complaint In Light Of Court's Denial Of His Motion For Transfer From Adminstrative Segregation by Greg Block, Kathleen L. Dickinson, Vicky Flandi, Dug Traub. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Farag, Shareef)
May 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/16/2011 ORDERING that the #26 motion to compel pltf's release from administrative segregation is DENIED; and the parties will, w/in 30 days, submit briefing on the issue of whether pltf's transfer to administrative segregation renders this case moot. (Yin, K)
May 18, 2011 SERVICE BY MAIL: #33 Order on Motion to Compel served on Charles E. Van Nort. (Yin, K)
March 8, 2011 Filing 32 OPPOSITION by Charles E. Van Nort to #17 MOTION to DISMISS. (Donati, J)
February 11, 2011 Filing 31 OPPOSITION by Plaintiff Charles E. Van Nort to #29 Opposition to Motion to Compel. (MAINTAINED ON PAPER) (Williams, D)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/10/11 ordering that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion to dismiss or a statement of non-opposition. (Plummer, M)
February 11, 2011 SERVICE BY MAIL: #30 Order served on Charles E. Van Nort. (Plummer, M)
January 25, 2011 Filing 29 OPPOSITION by Greg Block, Kathleen L. Dickinson, Vicky Flandi, Dug Traub to #26 MOTION to COMPEL. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Farag, Shareef)
January 10, 2011 Filing 28 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME by Greg Block, Kathleen L. Dickinson, Vicky Flandi, Dug Traub. (Farag, Shareef)
January 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER by Chief Judge Anthony W. Ishii: Due to the elevation of Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller to the position of District Judge, this action is temporarily assigned to *Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman*. (Davis, D)
January 6, 2011 SERVICE BY MAIL: #27 Order Reassigning Magistrate Judge served on Charles E. Van Nort. (Davis, D)
January 4, 2011 Filing 26 MOTION to COMPEL defendant to release Plaintiff from Administrative Segregation by Charles E. Van Nort. (Williams, D)
December 10, 2010 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of Handling Attorney by Greg Block, Kathleen L. Dickinson, Vicky Flandi, Dug Traub. Attorney Ramirez, Eugene P. added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Ramirez, Eugene)
December 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/6/2010 ORDERING that w/in 14 days, dft Block shall pay to the USM the sum of $90.00, unless w/in that time dft files a written statement showing good cause for failure to waive service; the clerk to serve a copy of this order on the USM. (Yin, K)
December 7, 2010 SERVICE BY MAIL: #24 Order served on Charles E. Van Nort. Copy of order served on USM. (Yin, K)
November 23, 2010 Filing 23 REQUEST for reimbursement by the USM. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 23, 2010 Filing 22 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Greg Block served on 11/17/2010. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 4, 2010 Filing 21 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Mitchell A. Wrosch on behalf of Greg Block, Kathleen L. Dickinson, Vicky Flandi, Dug Traub. Attorney Wrosch, Mitchell A. added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Wrosch, Mitchell)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/28/2010 GRANTING pltf's #18 motion for an extension of time; and pltf to file and serve a response to dfts' motion to dismiss on or before 1/10/2011; dfts' reply due 7 days thereafter. (Yin, K)
October 29, 2010 SERVICE BY MAIL: #20 Order on Motion for Extension served on Charles E. Van Nort. (Yin, K)
October 20, 2010 Filing 19 [DISREGARD-DUPLICATE OF #18 ] MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME until 01/10/11 to file response to #17 Motion to Dismiss by Charles E. Van Nort. (Williams, D) Modified on 10/22/2010 (Plummer, M).
October 20, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION for 90-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File his response to #17 MOTION to DISMISS and for an order to the law library to give him a word processor by Charles E. Van Nort. (Duong, D)
October 1, 2010 Filing 17 MOTION to DISMISS by Greg Block, Kathleen L. Dickinson, Vicky Flandi, Dug Traub. Attorney Coleman, Susan Eileen added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Of D. Foston, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Coleman, Susan)
September 22, 2010 Filing 16 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Kathleen L. Dickinson, Vicky Flandi and Dug Traub Waiver sent on 6/21/2010. (Manzer, C)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/8/2010 GRANTING dfts' #14 motion for an extension of time in which to file an initial responsive pleading, up to and including 10/2/2010. (Yin, K)
September 9, 2010 SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order on Motion for Extension of Time served on Charles E. Van Nort. (Yin, K)
September 2, 2010 Filing 14 MOTION for 30-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to to File Initial Responsive Pleading re #10 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint by Greg Block, Kathleen L. Dickinson, Dug Traub. Attorney Coleman, Susan Eileen added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service)(Coleman, Susan) Modified on 9/3/2010 (Plummer, M).
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING USM to serve process w/in 10 days on dfts Kathleen L. Dickinson, Vicky Flandi, Greg Block, and Dug Traub signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/3/2010. The clerk is directed to fwd to the USM documents for service and this order. The clerk shall also send pltf a copy of the Local Rules. (Yin, K)
June 4, 2010 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order and LR served on Charles E. Van Nort. The USM served w/ instructions for service, completed summons, 4 USM-285 forms, 5 copies each of the 2/12/10 amended cmplt and #13 service process order. (Yin, K)
May 26, 2010 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS: 1 Summons, 4 USM-285 Forms, and 5 copies of the amended complaint by Charles E. Van Nort. (Benson, A.)
May 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 05/07/10 DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms. Service is appropriate for Kathleen L. Dickinson, Vicky Flandi, Greg Block, Dug Traub. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 4 USM-285 Forms, and 1 copy of the Amended Complaint filed on 02/12/10 to be completed and returned within 30 days. (Plummer, M)
May 10, 2010 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Service Documents Order, 1 summons, 4 USM-285 forms, instruction sheet and a copy of the 02/12/10 amended complaint served on Charles E. Van Nort. (Plummer, M)
February 12, 2010 Filing 10 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT COMPLAINT against all defendants by Charles E. Van Nort. (Owen, K)
January 12, 2010 Filing 9 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: IFP application #2 served on Director of CDC. (Plummer, M)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Charles Van Nort signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 01/11/10. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 01/11/10 granting #2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $1.20. All fees to be collected in accordance with the court's CDC order filed concurrently herewith. Plaintiff's complaint #1 is dismissed. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file an amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
January 12, 2010 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis,, served on Charles E. Van Nort. (Plummer, M)
January 12, 2010 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order Directing Prisoner Payment, served on Charles E. Van Nort. (Plummer, M)
December 7, 2009 Filing 6 AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all defendants by Charles E. Van Nort. (Suttles, J)
October 23, 2009 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR STATUS by Charles E. Van Nort. (Becknal, R) (Response Sent - The Court will notify you as soon as any action is taken in your case.) Modified on 11/2/2009 (Yin, K).
June 17, 2009 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION by US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Charles E. Van Nort. (Matson, R)
June 9, 2009 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Consent Deadline set for 7/13/2009 (Attachments: #1 Order Re Consent) (Duong, D)
June 9, 2009 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Charles E. Van Nort. (Duong, D)
June 8, 2009 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Charles E. Van Nort. (Duong, D)
June 8, 2009 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against all defendants by Charles E. Van Nort.(Duong, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Van Nort v. Dickinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen L. Dickinson
Represented By: Eugene P. Ramirez
Represented By: Mitchell A. Wrosch
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Block
Represented By: Eugene P. Ramirez
Represented By: Mitchell A. Wrosch
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dug Traub
Represented By: Eugene P. Ramirez
Represented By: Mitchell A. Wrosch
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicky Flandi
Represented By: Eugene P. Ramirez
Represented By: Mitchell A. Wrosch
Represented By: Shareef Farag
Represented By: Susan Eileen Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Edward Van Nort
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?