Gamez Jr v. IndyMac Bank et al
Plaintiff: Antonio M. Gamez, Jr.
Defendant: IndyMac Bank, Indymac Bank, F.S.B., Regional Trustee Service Corp, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., WSP Financial Group, Inc., John Manuel Santos and Sang So
Case Number: 2:2009cv01628
Filed: June 11, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/22/2010 re 46 48 51 ORDERING that the Court declines to continue exercising supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claims alleged in Plaintiff's second amended complaint and those claims are dismissed without prejudice under 28 U.S.C. 1367(c)(3). Therefore, this action shall be closed. CASE CLOSED. (Duong, D)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 2/25/10 GRANTING defendant's 35 Motion to Dismiss claims against MERS. Plaintiff is granted leave to amend; amended complaint is due within 14 days of the date of this order. (Owen, K)
October 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/16/09 DISMISSING defendants Sang So and WSP Financial Group, Inc.; plaintiff shall give reason by 4:00 p.m. on 10/28/09 as to why defendants Indymac Bank and Indymac Bank, F.S.B. should not be dismissed. (Owen, K)
October 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 10/1/2009 ORDERING 11 the First Amended Complaint is STRICKEN and 13 the Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. (Reader, L)
September 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/18/2009 ORDERING Status Conference RESET for 10/19/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Parties are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE in writing no later than 4 :00 p.m. on 10/5/2009 why sanctions should not be imposed again them and/or their counsel under FRCP 16(f) for failure to file a timely status report. If a hearing is requested, it will be held on 10/19/09 just prior to the status conference. A status report shall be filed no later than 14 days prior to the status conference.(Waggoner, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gamez Jr v. IndyMac Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio M. Gamez, Jr.
Represented By: Michael J.M. Brook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IndyMac Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indymac Bank, F.S.B.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Trustee Service Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WSP Financial Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Manuel Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sang So
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?