Mayhugh v. Commisioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Denise F Mayhugh
Defendant: Commisioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2009cv01699
Filed: June 19, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402 Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 5/10/10 DISMISSING CASE. This action is DISMISSED with prejudice due to pltf's multiple failures to comply with court orders and failure to prosecute this action. CASE CLOSED. (Carlos, K)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/26/10: The court's February 8, 2010 order to show cause is discharged 15 . Plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment and/or remand is extended to April 30, 2010. (Kaminski, H)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/8/10 ORDERING that plaintiff shall show cause in writing within 15 days of the date of this order why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution.(Dillon, M)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/17/2009 GRANTING 10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer; and defendant's answer filed 11/16/2009 is deemed timely. (Matson, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mayhugh v. Commisioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise F Mayhugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commisioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?