Wurtzberger v. Resmae Mortgage, et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Wurtzberger
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registation Systems, Inc., HSBC Bank USA, Resmae Mortgage Corporation, America's Servicing Company and NDEX West, LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv01718
Filed: June 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sutter
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 4/29/2010 ORDERING that for the foregoing reasons, each Defendant's 27 32 dismissal motion is GRANTED with prejudice, and this action shall be closed. CASE CLOSED. (Duong, D)
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 10/6/09 ORDERING that Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED. However, Plaintiff requests leave to amend his complaint should any claim be dismissed. Plaintiff is granted ten (10) days from the date on which this Order is filed to file an amended complaint. (Becknal, R)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE AND CONTINUING STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) CONFERENCE signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/15/09 ORDERING that the Plaintiff is Ordered to Show Cause ("OSC") in a writing to be filed no later than 4:00 p.m. on 10 /5/09, why sanctions should not be imposed against him and/or his counsel for failure to file a timely status report. The written response shall also state whether Plaintiff or his counsel is at fault, and whether a hearing is requested on the OSC. If a hearing is requested, it will be held on 10/19/09, at 9:00 a.m., just prior to the status conference, which is rescheduled to that date. A status report shall be filed no later than 14 days prior to the status conference. (Becknal, R)
August 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/25/09: Plaintiff's counsel shall inform Plaintiff that Plaintiff shall attend the hearing on Plaintiff's counsel's motion for withdrawal as counsel of record. HEARING as to 13 MOTION to WITHDRAW as ATTORNEY continued to 9/14/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.. (Kaminski, H)
August 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 8/13/09 ORDERING that Pltf's counsel shall provide the court with assurance that Pltf still resides at the address at which the 13 motion to withdraw as attorney was mailed before the motion will be decided. The motion hearing is continued to 8/31/09 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. Counsel shall serve a copy of this order on Pltf. (Engbretson, K.)
July 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 07/28/09: 7 Motion to Dismiss Hearing reset for 9/14/2009 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (GEB) before Judge Garland E. Burrell Jr. (Manzer, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wurtzberger v. Resmae Mortgage, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Wurtzberger
Represented By: Mark A. Shoemaker-NOT CAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registation Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Harold Ricky Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA
Represented By: Harold Ricky Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resmae Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Servicing Company
Represented By: Harold Ricky Jones, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDEX West, LLC
Represented By: Edward A. Treder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?