Pacific Northwest Inc. v. Randhawa et al
Plaintiff: Pacific Northwest Inc.
Defendant: Satvinder Palsingh Randhawa and Lorna Marie Randhawa
Case Number: 2:2009cv02027
Filed: July 22, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Both
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 221 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Chief Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/5/14 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION for JUDGMENT as a Matter of Law, or in the Alternative for New Trial or Remittitur 210 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER continuing Trial signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/4/2012. The 1/22/2013 Jury Trial is VACATED and RE-SCHEDULED for 12/2/2013 at at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (MCE). Parties shall file Trial Briefs no later than 9/19/2013. Accordingly , the 11/29/2012 Final Pretrial Conference is VACATED and RE-SET for 10/3/2013 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7 (MCE). Joint Final Pretrial Statement is due no later than 9/12/2013. Personal appearances of trial attorneys or person(s) in pro se is mandato ry for Final Pretrial Conference. Telephonic appearances for this hearing are NOT permitted. Any Evidentiary or Procedural Motion shall be filed by 9/12/2013. Oppositions must be filed by 9/19/2013 and any Reply must be filed by 9/26/2013. Motions will beheard by Court at same time as Final Pretrial Conference. (Marciel, M)
January 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 01/18/12 ORDERING that defendant's 110 Motion to Dismiss Second Cause of Action for Fraud is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
May 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 05/20/11 ORDERING that plf's 95 Motion to Amend the Complaint is GRANTED; w/i 10 days plf may file the Revised Proposed Second Amended Complaint attached to its 100 Reply. Although the Court recognizes that dfts' Opposition requests an across-the board extension of all dates set forth in the PTSO in the event this motion is granted, any motion in that regard is neither properly before the Court at this time nor adequately briefed. (Benson, A.)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/3/11: In order to afford the parties an opportunity to address the correct standard, the presently scheduled May 5, 2011 hearing date for the Motion (ECF No. 95) is hereby continued to May 19, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. Counsel are directed to file simultaneous supplemental briefing on the issue of whether Rule 16's prerequisites have been satisfied not later than May 10, 2011. That briefing shall not exceed ten (10) pages in length. No responsive briefing will be permitted.(Matson, R)
April 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 4/14/2011. Defendants' 86 Motion to Dismiss plaintiff's RICO claim is GRANTED. Plaintiff will NOT be permitted to amend that claim at this juncture. (Marciel, M)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/18/11 ORDERING that the depo of dft Randhawa shall take place on 03/04/11; dfts' depo of Williams shall take place on 03/01/11 at 9:00 a.m. in Portland, OR; dfts' depo of Alirol shall take place 03/02/11 at 10:00 a.m. in Portland OR. (Benson, A.)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 01/13/11 DENYING 68 Motion for Summary Judgment ; GRANTING 79 Motion for Leave to substitute the finalized declaration in Opposition to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment.Plaintiff is GRANTED twenty (20) days from the date this Order is signed within which to file an amended complaint. (Williams, D).
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 04/13/10 GRANTING 48 Motion for Leave to file Third-Party Complaint. (Williams, D)
April 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 04/02/10 DENYING 44 plf's Motion for Writ of Attachment. (Benson, A.)
January 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/12/10 ORDERING that Plaintiff's MOTION for Writ of Attachment 25 is DENIED without prejudice. Defendant's Request for hearing 40 is DENIED as MOOT. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/09/09 ORDERING that dfts' Motion to Dismiss plf's Fraud and RICO claims, Motion for a More Definite Statement, and Motion to Strike allegations of diversity jurisdiction are DENIED. (Benson, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pacific Northwest Inc. v. Randhawa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pacific Northwest Inc.
Represented By: Herman A. D. Franck, V
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Satvinder Palsingh Randhawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorna Marie Randhawa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?