Chavez v. Haviland

Petitioner: Michael Ray Chavez
Respondent: John Haviland
Case Number: 2:2009cv02048
Filed: July 24, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Bommer on 4/4/11 GRANTING 33 Motion for Extension to file a Notice of Appeal. Petitioner has an additional 30 days from the date of this order to file a notice of appeal of the 3/3/11 Order denying his petition for writ of habeas corpus. (Donati, J)
February 22, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Bommer on 2/22/11 ORDERING that Petitioner's Motion to appoint counsel 28 is DENIED; and Petitioner's Motion for an extension of time 29 is DENIED. (Becknal, R)
December 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Bommer on 11/30/10: Petitioner's November 22, 2010, request for an extension of time is granted. Petitioner shall file his objections to the Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations within thirty days of the date of this order. (Kaminski, H)
September 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Bommer on 9/9/10 RECOMMENDING the 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Michael Ray Chavez be denied; REFERRED to Judge John A. Mendez; objections may be filed within 21 days after being served with these F&R's. (Carlos, K)
September 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 9/16/09 DIRECTING respondent to file a response to the petition w/in 60 days; reply due w/in 30 days of answer; if response is a motion, opposition or statement of non-opposition due w/in 30 days of motion, reply due w/in 15 days thereafter; the clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (cc: Michael Farrell)(Yin, K)
August 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/07/09 granting 3 Motion to Proceed IFP and denying 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Within 30 days petitioner shall file either a motion to stay or a motion to voluntary dismiss his unexhausted claims. (Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chavez v. Haviland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Michael Ray Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Haviland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?