Johnson v. Martel et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Johnson
Defendant: M. Martel, G Bishop and R M Kudlata
Case Number: 2:2009cv02103
Filed: July 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/30/11 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 5/3/11 55 are ADOPTED in full; Defendants' 10/27/10 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 51 is GRANTED; Defendants' 10/08/10 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT 48 is DENIED as moot; This Action is CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 55 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 5/2/2011 RECOMMENDING that dfts' motion for summary judgement be granted; and this action be closed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due w/in 20 days. (Yin, K)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/2/2010 GRANTING dfts Bishop and Kudlata's 49 request to modify the scheduling order; dfts 10/27/10 motion for summary judgment is DEEMED TIMELY. (Yin, K)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER denying 42 Motion for Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 05/06/10. (Plummer, M)
April 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 4/29/10: Plaintiff's April 19, 2010 motion to withdraw is granted. Plaintiff's January 18, 2010 motion for injunction is withdrawn. April 9, 2010 findings and recommendations are vacated. (Kaminski, H)
April 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 04/08/10 ORDERING the clerk of the court shall assign a District Judge to this matter. U.S. District Judge John A. Mendez randomly assigned to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's 01/28/10 motion be denied as moot. MOTION Injunction 18 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 20 days. (Plummer, M)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 2/23/2010 ORDERING that pltf's 20 motion for TRO be reassigned to case number 2:10-cv-0282 KJM. (Yin, K)
February 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 2/16/10 ORDERING that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this order on Jennifer Neill, Supervising Deputy Attorney General; and the court will consider any response to plaintiffs 1/28/10 request defendants may file within thirty days from the date of this order. (cc Jennifer Neill)(Dillon, M)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 11/11/09 DIRECTING USM to serve complaint filed on 07/30/09, on G Bishop and R M Kudlata. (Plummer, M)
August 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/24/09 ORDERING that pltf's 4 letter, construed as a request for injunctive relief is DENIED w/out prejudice. (Yin, K)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/18/09 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 2 request for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350 for this action. Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee in accordance with the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 1915.All fees shall be collected and paid in accordance with this court's order to the Dir ector of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation filed concurrently herewith. Service is appropriate for the following defendants: G. Bishop and R.M.Kudlata. The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff two USM-285 forms, one summons, an instruction sheet and a copy of the complaint filed July 30, 2009. Plt to submit the documents within 30 days from the date of this order. (Case management deadline 9/21/09) (Duong, D)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Martel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Bishop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R M Kudlata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?