Johnson v. Jacquez

Petitioner: Jason Wilbert Johnson
Respondent: Francisco Jacquez
Case Number: 2:2009cv02108
Filed: July 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Del Norte
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge James K. Singleton on 12/16/2014 DISMISSING CASE the Petition under 28:2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED; the Court DECLINES to issue a Certificate of Appealability; the Clerk of the Court is to enter judgment accordingly. CASE CLOSED (Reader, L) Modified on 12/17/2014 (Reader, L).
July 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/3/2014: Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time 47 to file his traverse is GRANTED. Petitioner's traverse is due within 30 days of the date of this order. (Owen, K)
July 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 07/25/13 ordering that within 21 days from the date of this order, petitioner shall comply with the 06/20/13 court order. (Plummer, M)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/20/13 ordering petitioner shall notify this court no later than 07/12/13, of the status of his state court habeas proceedings. In the event that the 05/22/13 petition was intended for the Cal ifornia Supreme Court, but inadvertently mailed to this court, in addition to providing notice of the status of his state habeas proceedings, petitioner shall file a habeas petition containing his unexhausted claims in the California Supreme Court no later than 07/12/13. (Plummer, M)
November 23, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/22/2011 ORDERING that within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a statement of compliance with this court's 34 6/8/2011 Order. Failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation that petitioner's unexhausted claims be dismissed.(Waggoner, D)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/7/11 ORDERING that Petitioners 31 request for copies of his exhibits is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to send petitioner a copy of his petition, including all attached exhibits. Petitioner is granted 45 days from the date of this order to file his state court petition. Petitioners 32 motion for transfer is DENIED. The Clerk is directed to terminate docket entries 25 , 26 , 31 and 32 . (Dillon, M)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 03/01/11 ADOPTING in full 22 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; GRANTING 3 Motion to Stay; DENYING 13 Motion to Dismiss ; Petitioner is directed to file a state habeas petition containing his unexhausted claims within 30 days and is admonished that he shall inform this court within 30 days after his claims are exhausted in state court. (Williams, D)
September 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/13/10 recommending that petitioner's motion to stay the case pending the exhaustion of his unexhausted claims be granted. Petitioner be directed to file a state hab eas petition containing his unexhausted claims within 30 days and be admonished that he shall inform this court within 30 days after his claims are exhausted in state court. Respondent's motion to dismiss be denied. MOTION to STAY 3 and MOTION to DISMISS 13 referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
July 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/26/2010 re 13 ORDERING that within 21 days of the date of this order, petitioner must file supplemental briefing demonstrating that good cause exists to stay the case. Alternatively, petitione r may elect to file an amended petition containing exhausted claims only. Also within 21 days of the date of this order, petitioner must file supplemental briefing explain why he is entitled to equitable tolling of the statute of limitations or how h is petition is otherwise not time-barred. Respondent may file a response to petitioner's supplemental briefing within 7 days of petitioner's filing. Failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that the action be dismissed.(Duong, D)
February 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/11/2010 ORDERING that petitioner's 2 request to proceed IFP is GRANTED; respondent to file a response to the petition w/in 60 days; reply due w/in 30 days of answer; if response is a moti on, opposition or statement of non-opposition due w/in 30 days of motion, reply due w/in 14 days thereafter; the clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the 7/30/09 petition, including the 7/30/09 motion to stay, and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General.(cc: Michael Farrell) (Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Jacquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jason Wilbert Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Francisco Jacquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?