Stevens v. Fuchs et al
Plaintiff: |
Donald L. Stevens |
Defendant: |
Matt Fuchs, Quentin Campbell and Butte County Parole Department |
Case Number: |
2:2009cv02111 |
Filed: |
July 30, 2009 |
Court: |
U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Sacramento Office |
County: |
Butte |
Presiding Judge: |
Gregory G. Hollows |
Nature of Suit: |
None |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 22, 2010 |
Filing
21
FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 6/21/10 recommending that this action be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to keep the court apprised of his current address. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
|
June 3, 2010 |
Filing
20
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 06/03/10 ordering plaintiff's claims against defendant Quentin Campbell are dismissed as are any claims by plaintiff against defendant Matt Fuchs with the exception of his claims regarding d amaged property, with leave to file a second amended complaint within 28 days from the date of service of this order. Upon filing a second amended complaint or expiration of the time allowed therefor, the court will make further orders for service of process upon some or all of the defendants. Plaintiff's 03/15/10 request for the appointment of counsel 17 is denied. (Plummer, M)
|
January 25, 2010 |
Filing
16
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 1/25/10 ORDERING that 13 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action, to be collected and paid in accordance with th is courts order to the Director of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation filed concurrently herewith. The complaint is dismissed for the reasons discussed above, with leave to file an amended complaint within twenty-eight days from the date of service of this order. (Dillon, M)
|
December 8, 2009 |
Filing
12
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/8/09 ORDERING that the 10 findings and recommendations are hereby VACATED; the clerk to send pltf a new ifp application; pltf to submit w/in 28 days, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed ifp or the appropriate filing fee; and there will be no further extensions of time. (Yin, K)
|
October 30, 2009 |
Filing
10
[VACATED PURSUANT TO 12 ORDER] FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/30/09 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Randomly assigned and referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 20 days.(Dillon, M) Modified on 12/8/2009 (Yin, K).
|
August 10, 2009 |
Filing
8
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/07/09 dismissing 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The clerk of the court is directed to send plaintiff a new application to proceed IFP by a prisoner. Plaintiff shall submit within 30 days from the date of this order, a completed application to proceed IFP. (Plummer, M)
|
July 29, 2009 |
Filing
4
ORDER OF TRANSFER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 7/29/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2009) [Transferred from cand on 7/30/2009.]
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?