Rider v. Sacramento County Sheriff's Department
Plaintiff: Bridgette Rider
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff's Department
Case Number: 2:2009cv02125
Filed: July 30, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 01/27/11 ORDERING this case is DISMISSED; each side to bear their own costs and attorneys fees. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
October 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/26/10 ORDERING that the Sheriff's Dept's 16 Motion for Extension of Time is DENIED w/o prejudice. (Benson, A.)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 8/9/10: Discovery shall be completed by Friday, September 17, 2010.(Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rider v. Sacramento County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette Rider
Represented By: Robert N. Kitay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?