Woodard v. Haviland
Plaintiff: Robert Boston Woodard
Defendant: John W. Haviland
Case Number: 2:2009cv02145
Filed: August 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 82 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 09/29/11 ordering the action denominated CIV S 2:11-cv-1807 GEB JFM be and the same hereby reassigned to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton and for all further proceedings. Henceforth the caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as CIV S-11-1807 LKK JFM. It is further ordered that the clerk of the court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Plummer, M)
April 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 03/31/11 ordering all dates currently set in this matter are hereby vacated. Dispositional documents shall be filed no later than 30 days from the date of this order. Upon the exhaustion of administrative remedies and the refiling of this matter, the filing fee is waived. (Plummer, M)
January 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/27/11 ORDERING that the 2/17/11 hearing is hereby moved to 3/17/11 at 11:00 a.m. in courtroom 26. The parties oppositions to the cross-motions for summary judgment will be filed on or before 3/3/11.(Dillon, M)
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 1/13/2011 and stipulated between the parties extending time for dft's response; dft to file an opposition to pltf's motion for summary judgment on or before 1/27/2011; and the 1/27/2011 cross-motions for summary judgment hearing is CONTINUED to 2/17/2011 at 11:00 AM in 8th floor courtroom (JFM) before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds. (Yin, K)
February 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 2/4/10 ORDERING that this matter is referred to the courts Alternative Dispute Resolution Coordinator, Sujean Younger, for the scheduling of a settlement conference; Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order on Sujean Younger; IT IS RECOMMENDED that 4 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, construed as a motion for preliminary injunctive relief, be denied. Referred to Judge Lawrence K. Karlton; Objections due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 45 DISCOVERY and SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 12/10/09: Discovery due by 4/2/2010; All Pretrial Motions, except motions to compel discovery, due by 5/28/2010; Pretrial Conference and Trial dates will be set, as appropriate. (Yin, K)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 10/8/09: STIPULATION REGARDING PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION RECORD is APPROVED.(Kaminski, H)
August 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DIRECTING USM to serve process w/in 10 days on dft John W. Haviland signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/27/09. The clerk is directed to fwd to the USM instructions for service, summons, copies of the cmplt, the form re consent or request for reassignment and this order. The clerk shall also send pltf a copy of the Local Rules. (cc: USM) (Yin, K)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER AND WRIT ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 08/18/09 ordering issuance of a writ of habeas corpus ad testificandum; Custodian to produce Robert Boston Woodard at 09/10/09 at 1:30 p.m. before Judge John F. Moulds via videoconfer ence. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ.(Plummer, M)(3 certified copies sent to Warden of California Correctional Center) Modified on 8/19/2009 (Plummer, M).
August 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/11/09. Service is appropriate for John W. Haviland. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 1 USM-285 Forms, and 1 copy of the Complaint filed on 8/3/09. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the Notice of Submission of Documents and submit the appropriate documents to the court.(Dillon, M)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds on 8/5/09 ORDERING that plaintiff shall serve a copy of the 4 MOTION for TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER on defendant Warden John W. Haviland or provide a copy to the prison during the regular hours the w arden is present by noon on Friday, 8/7/09. Plaintiff shall hand-serve a copy of plaintiffs 8/5/09 filings on theAttorney General for the State of California by noon on Friday, 8/7/09. Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2009 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 26 before Magistrate Judge John F. Moulds.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodard v. Haviland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Boston Woodard
Represented By: David Newdorf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John W. Haviland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?