Jones v. Cate

Petitioner: Dayle Wayne Jones
Respondent: Matthew Cate
Case Number: 2:2009cv02169
Filed: August 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 1/14/11 ORDERING the Findings and Recommendations ADOPTED IN FULL; petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus DENIED; and a certificate of appealability if DENIED. CASE CLOSED. (Carlos, K)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 10/8/2010 RECOMMENDING that ptnr's application for writ of hc be denied. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections due w/in 14 days. (Yin, K)
May 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/27/2010 ORDERING that petitioner's 17 motion for an extension of time is GRANTED; petitioner's 5/24/10 traverse is DEEMED TIMELY FILED; and petitioner's 22 motion to defer ruling until receiving the traverse is VACATED. (Yin, K)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 08/19/09 DIRECTING RESPONDENT to File a Response to Petition within 60 days from the date of this order. Clerk to serve a copy of this order, a copy of the Petition and the Order re Consent on the Attorney General. (Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dayle Wayne Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Cate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?