Villasenor v. Martell
Petitioner: Antonio V. Villasenor
Respondent: Michael Martell
Case Number: 2:2009cv02324
Filed: August 21, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 45 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 06/08/16 recommending that petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
September 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 09/02/14 ordering respondent shall file and serve an amended answer that is responsive to the amended petition within 60 days from the date of this order. Petitioner's reply, if any, shall be filed and served within 30 days of service of an answer. (Plummer, M)
March 7, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 03/07/13 ordering that the parties show cause, in writing, on or before 03/21/13, why respondent's motion to dismiss 23 and petitioner's motion to stay 28 should not be dismissed as moot. (Plummer, M)
January 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/29/2013 ORDERING the parties to SHOW CAUSE, in writing, on or before 2/11/2013, why respondent's 23 motion to dismiss, and petitioner's 28 motion to stay should not be denied as moot. (Yin, K)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/12/10 ordering petitioner's motion for stay and abeyance 8 is granted. Petitioner shall inform the court within 30 days of the date when all of his claims have been exhausted in state court. Plaintiff's 05/25/10 motion to proceed in forma pauperis 13 is denied as unnecessary. (Plummer, M)
May 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/20/2010 ORDERING that petitioner's 10 motion to proceed IFP is GRANTED; the clerk to serve a copy of this order together w/ a copy of the 8/21/09 petition w/ any and all attachments on the Attorney General; respondent to file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to petitioner's 8 motion for a stay w/in 30 days; and petitioner's reply due w/in 14 days thereafter. (cc: Michael Farrell)(Yin, K)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/6/2010 ORDERING petitioner to submit either the filing fee or the ifp application w/in 30 days; the clerk to mail petitioner an ifp form and to terminate the 7 motion seeking clarification. (Yin, K)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/4/09 ORDERING that within 30 days from the day this order is served, petitioner may submit either the filing fee or the application to proceed in forma pauperis. Clerk of the Court is directed to mail to petitioner a form application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villasenor v. Martell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Antonio V. Villasenor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Martell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?