Gant v. Bosenko et al
Plaintiff: Tony Austin Gant
Defendant: Tom Bosenko, Ryan Henrioulle, John Church and Randy Joiner
Case Number: 2:2009cv02439
Filed: August 31, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 1/11/2012 ORDERING that defendant's 27 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER AND FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/6/2011 ORDERING the clerk to randomly assign a district judge to this case; and RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(b). Assigned and Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
October 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/27/11 ORDERING that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition, if any, to the motion for summary judgment. The 11/3/11 hearing is VACATED.(Dillon, M)
August 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 08/24/10 ordering plaintiff's second amended complaint is dismissed. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall complete the attached notice of amendment and submit it to the court along with an original and 1 copy of the third amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
April 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/21/2010 ORDERING that pltf's amended cmplt is DISMISSED; w/in 30 days, pltf to complete and return the Notice of Amendment w/ the required documents. (Yin, K)
March 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/3/10 DENYING pltf's 8 request for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
February 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Tony Austin Gant signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/23/2010. CDC is to collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter monthly payments and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gant v. Bosenko et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Austin Gant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Bosenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Henrioulle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Joiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?