Diaz et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Angelina Diaz, Sabrina Diaz and Armida Diaz
Defendant: United States of America and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 2:2009cv02511
Filed: September 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Frank C. Damrell
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 23:134 P.I.- Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER ON RELEASING SETTLEMENT FUNDS signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/6/2015 ORDERING that funds should now be released to Plaintiff Sabrina Diaz, as she has reached the age of 18. (Zignago, K.)
November 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/7/13 RELEASING settlement funds. (Manzer, C)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 01/07/11 re 33 Proposed Order regarding settlement amounts as to minor plaintiffs and attorney fees to be paid in accordance with this order.(Benson, A.)
November 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 29 CONDITIONAL SETTLEMENT STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 11/23/10. (Kaminski, H)
November 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION and ORDE R signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 11/12/10: This Court hereby extends the time to hear the Petition for Minors' Compromise to 1/14/2011 at 10:00 a.m. and orders that the final dispositional documents are now due on or before November 12, 2010. (Kaminski, H)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 10/12/10 ORDERING that based on the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing, this Court hereby extends the time to hear the Petition for Minors' Compromise and orders that the final dispositional documents are now due on or before 11/10/10. (Becknal, R)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 8/10/10 ORDERING that the final dispositional documents are now due on or before 10/10/2010. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER 18 for extension of time signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr. on 7/6/2010. Final dispositional doucments are now due on or before 8/10/2010. (Marciel, M)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Judge Frank C. Damrell, Jr on 9/14/09 GRANTING 4 Motion to Appoint Armida Diaz as Guardian ad Litem for the minor, Angelina Diaz. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelina Diaz
Represented By: Christopher William Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina Diaz
Represented By: Christopher William Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armida Diaz
Represented By: Christopher William Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?