Chapman v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Byron Chapman
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation and Sycamore Partners, LLC
Case Number: 2:2009cv02526
Filed: September 9, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 3/2/11 ORDERING the 32 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. (Becknal, R)
January 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 1/6/2011 GRANTING each defendant's 16 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's state claims are DISMISSED without prejudice under 28 USC 1367 (c)(3). (Marciel, M)
June 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 06/22/10 ORDERING that the rebuttal expert witness disclosure date as to Sycamore is CONTINUED to 07/31/10, and all remaining pretrial and trial dates in this matter are unchanged. (Benson, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Starbucks Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Chapman
Represented By: Lynn Hubbard, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sycamore Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?