Pombrio v. Salinas

Petitioner: Scott E Pombrio
Respondent: S M Salinas
Case Number: 2:2009cv02577
Filed: September 15, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Judge William B. Shubb on 03/17/11 ORDERING that petitioner's 44 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. (Benson, A.)
January 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 40 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 01/12/11 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
December 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 37 Motion for Change of venue signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/13/2010. (Duong, D)
November 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/19/2010 ORDERING that the 33 findings and recommendations are VACATED; ptnr is GRANTED leave to proceed IFP; ptnr's 8/23/10 application for writ of hc is DISMISSED; ptnr to file an amended application w/in 30 days; the clerk to send ptnr 2 copies of the writ of hc forms. (Yin, K)
August 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/5/2010 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed w/out prejudice. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due w/in 21 days. (Yin, K)
June 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 06/09/10 ordering all pleadings filed by petitioner in this action are dismissed. All motions filed by petitioner 2 , 4 , 11 , 15 , 16 , 18 , 19 , 20 , 21 , 22 , 23 , 28 , 29 , 30 , 31 are de nied. The clerk of the court shall send petition the court's forms for application for writ of habeas corpus under 28 USC 2254 and civil rights complaint. Petitioner is granted 30 days within which to file an application for writ of habeas cor pus or a civil rights complaint on the appropriate form provided by the clerk. Petitioner shall not file any further frivolous motions and, unless or until the court orders service of any amended pleading, shall not file any other pleadings in this action without court permission in advance. (Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pombrio v. Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Scott E Pombrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: S M Salinas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?