In Re: City of Vallejo, CA
Debtor: City of Vallejo, CA
Trustee: Office of the US Trustee (Sac)
Creditor: Official Unsecured Creditors Committee of City of Vallejo Retirees
Appellant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 2376
Case Number: 2:2009cv02603
Filed: September 17, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1334 Bankruptcy Appeal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 6/14/10, ORDERING that IBEW's appeal of the Bankruptcy Court's Order granting the City's Motion for Approval of Rejection of IBEW's Collective Bargaining Agreement is DENIED, and the Bankruptcy Court's March 13, 2009 Memorandum decision and August 31, 2009 Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law are AFFIRMED.(Kastilahn, A)
March 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/26/10 ORDERING the Bankruptcy Appeal Hearing set for 4/7/10 is RE-SET to 3/17/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. (Carlos, K)
February 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/4/2010 GRANTING the parties' request to extend the time for Appellant to file its reply brief in support of its appeal to 2/16/2010. (Engbretson, K.)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 12/10/09 ORDERING the City of Vallejo's Application to Extend the Filing Date for the City's Opposition Brief in Appeal from Bankruptcy Court 9 is GRANTED. The time is EXTENDED by an additional 21 days by which it must file its opposition brief in this appeal. Accordingly, the City of Vallejo's opposition brief must be filed with this Court not later than 36 days after service of appellant's opening brief. (Carlos, K)
October 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 10/22/2009 GRANTING 3 Motion to supplement the record. (Suttles, J) Modified on 10/27/2009 (Manzer, C).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: City of Vallejo, CA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: City of Vallejo, CA
Represented By: Marc Aaron Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Office of the US Trustee (Sac)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Creditor: Official Unsecured Creditors Committee of City of Vallejo Retirees
Represented By: James C. Paul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers, Local 2376
Represented By: Kelly Ann Woodruff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?