Falcocchia et al v. Saxon Mortgage, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: John J. Falcocchia and Rachel D. Falcocchia
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage, Inc., Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc., Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas and Old Republic Default Management Services
Case Number: 2:2009cv02700
Filed: September 28, 2009
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sutter
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Lawrence K. Karlton
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1444 Petition for Removal- Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 4/13/11: The dispositional documents disposing of the case shall be filed no later than forty-five (45) days from the effective date of this order. All hearing dates heretofore set in this matter are hereby VACATED. (Kaminski, H)
August 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 08/10/10 GRANTING in part and DENYING in part 36 Motion to Dismiss. The Court DISMISSES plaintiffs' TILA claim; the Court also DISMISSES plaintiffs' claim of breach of implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing; dismissal of these claims is WITH PREJUDICE; defendants' motion is otherwise DENIED. (Williams, D)
July 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 7/28/2010 ORDERING that the hearing on the 36 motion currently set for August 9, 2010 is VACATED. The deadline for submission of defendants' reply memorandum, if any, remains unchanged.(Duong, D)
May 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 26 dfts' Motion to Dismiss, signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 5/27/10. Pltfs are GRANTED 21 days to file an amended complaint seeking to cure the defects identified in the order as to pltfs' RESPA claim. (Kastilahn, A)
February 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 2/12/10 ORDERING the defendants' motion to dismiss, 6 is GRANTED IN PART. The Court DENIES the motion as to the following claims: Fourth Claim, under the UCL, as to Saxon Mortgage, Inc. and Saxon Mortgage Svcs, Inc., insofar as this claim is predicated upon a violation of RESPA; Ninth Claim, for violation of RESPA, as to Saxon Mortgage, Inc. and Saxon Mortgage Svcs, Inc; and GRANTS the remainder of the motion. Plaintiffs agreed to dism iss their Rosenthal Act claim without requesting leave to amend, and this claim is therefore dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiffs' remaining claims are dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiffs are granted (21) days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. (Becknal, R)
October 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Lawrence K. Karlton on 10/30/2009 ORDERING that the hearing on 6 Motion to Dismiss set for 11/9/2009 is vacated. (Suttles, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falcocchia et al v. Saxon Mortgage, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage, Inc.
Represented By: David Lee Chaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saxon Mortgage Services, Inc.
Represented By: David Lee Chaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank Trust Company Americas
Represented By: David Lee Chaffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Default Management Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John J. Falcocchia
Represented By: William O Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel D. Falcocchia
Represented By: William O Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?