Oremus v. California Highway Patrol et al
Plaintiff: Richard C. Oremus
Defendant: California Highway Patrol and Rocklin Police Department
Case Number: 2:2009cv02734
Filed: October 1, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/11/2010 DENYING pltf's 14 request for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
July 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/14/10 RECOMMENDING that Plaintiffs complaint be dismissed for failure to state a claim for which relief can be granted. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
February 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/25/10 ORDERING the director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the prison trust account of Richard C. Oremus to the clerk until the balance of $350 is paid in full. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order and the plaintiff's IFP on the Director of the CDC. The clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the financial department of the court. (cc Financial, CDC Prisoner Payment Orders )(Dillon, M)
November 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/18/09 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a complete application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, with the required certified copy of his trust account statement, or the appropriate filing fee; and Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new form Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oremus v. California Highway Patrol et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard C. Oremus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Highway Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocklin Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?