Moreno v. Martin et al

Plaintiff: Louie Moreno, Jr.
Defendant: Martin, Turrey, Wright, Bell, John McGinness, McCoy, Roberts, Sacramento Sheriff's Medical Department and Sacramento Sheriff's Mental Health Department
Case Number: 2:2009cv02778
Filed: October 6, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/21/10 recommending that this action be dismissed without prejudice for plaintiffs failure to keep the court apprised of his current address re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Louie Moreno, Jr. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days.(Dillon, M)
October 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/14/10 ORDERING that the Clerk of Court is hereby directed to serve this order, and the orders bearing Docket Numbers 10 and 11 , upon plaintiff at Deuel Vocational Institute, P.O. Box 600, Tracy, CA 95378-0600.(Dillon, M)
September 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR PAYMENT OF INMATE FILING FEE signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/14/10. The Sheriff of Sacramento County shall collect from Plaintiff's trust account an initial partial filing fee and shall forward the amount to the Clerk of the Court. Thereafter, the Sheriff of Sacramento County shall collect monthly payments and forward them to the Clerk, until the $350.00 filing fee for this action has been paid in full. The Clerk of is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of Plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit on the Sheriff of Sacramento County, Attention: Inmate Trust Account, 651 I Street, Sacramento, California 95814. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc: Sheriff of Sacramento County)(Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/10/09 DENYING 7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moreno v. Martin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louie Moreno, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McGinness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento Sheriff's Medical Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento Sheriff's Mental Health Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?