Winn v. Chrysler Group LLC, et al.,
Plaintiff: Daniel Stacey Winn, Kory Michael Winn, Breeonna Winn and Erika Winn
Defendant: Chrysler Group LLC, Daimler A.G., Magna Powertran, Inc, Magna International of America, Inc., Great Valley Chrysler Jeep, Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company, S.J. Denham, Inc. and Deborah Matis-Engle
Case Number: 2:2009cv02805
Filed: October 8, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Nature of Suit: Defendant
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Wrongful Death
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 4/8/10 ORDERING dft Chrysler's Motion for Reconsideration 43 is DENIED; Pltfs' request that that court assess costs against Chrysler for bringing this motion is also DENIED; The stay placed on remanding this case to Shasta County is lifted; the case is transferred and the Clerk of this is ordered to close the file. (cc: cert copy to Shasta County Superior Court) (Carlos, K)
January 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/29/2010 GRANTING 38 Ex Parte Application. The Court's order remanding this case to the state court is stayed pending adjudication of a Motion for Reconsideration. (Matson, R)
December 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/23/09 ORDERING that Pltf's 15 Motion to Remand is GRANTED. Dft's 8 Motion to Change Venue is DENIED as moot. CASE REMANDED to Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Shasta. Copy of remand order sent. CASE CLOSED. (Engbretson, K.)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 12/10/09: First Cause of Action (Strict Liability); Second Cause of Action (Negligence); Third Cause of Action (Negligence); and Fourth Cause of Action (Breach of Implied Warranty) of the First Amended Complaint herein be and hereby are dismissed without prejudice as to Chrysler Group LLC ONLY. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winn v. Chrysler Group LLC, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Group LLC
Represented By: Wayne Allen Wolff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daimler A.G.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magna Powertran, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magna International of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great Valley Chrysler Jeep
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enterprise Rent-A-Car Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S.J. Denham, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deborah Matis-Engle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Stacey Winn
Represented By: Todd Everitt Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kory Michael Winn
Represented By: Todd Everitt Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breeonna Winn
Represented By: Todd Everitt Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erika Winn
Represented By: Todd Everitt Slaughter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?