Vaughn v. Dickinson et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Vaughn
Defendant: Kathleen L. Dickinson, Liz Olmstead and CDCR Director
Case Number: 2:2009cv03023
Filed: October 29, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying 19 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 02/23/11. (Plummer, M)
January 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 01/19/11 DISMISSING CASE. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/9/2010 ORDERING pltf to SHOW CAUSE in writing, w/in 30 days, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim. (Yin, K)
October 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER denying 10 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 09/30/10. (Plummer, M)
May 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/7/2010 ORDERING pltf to SHOW CAUSE in writing, w/in 30 days why this action should not be dismissed for failure to state a claim. (Yin, K)
November 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Gregory Vauhgn signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/4/09. CDC is to collect monthly payments and fwd to the clerk until the $350 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of pltf's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial w/ a copy of this order. (cc: CDC, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn v. Dickinson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen L. Dickinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liz Olmstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CDCR Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?