Williams et al vs Bank of America, et al
Plaintiff: Frank Williams and Cindy Williams
Defendant: Bank Of America, America's Wholesale Lender, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Meridian Capital, Inc., Anatoly Stavchansky and Jeff Wind
Case Number: 2:2009cv03060
Filed: November 3, 2009
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Presiding Judge: John F. Moulds
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 7/29/10 ORDERING that Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss 19 is GRANTED with prejudice. Defendants' MOTION TO STRIKE is MOOT. Plaintiffs' CROSS-MOTION to Dismiss for lack of jurisdiction is 24 DENIED. Plaintiffs' Cross Motion to Strike is DENIED. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L) Modified on 7/30/2010 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 05/05/10 ORDERING that dfts' 22 Request to Appear Telephonically at the 05/19/10 hearing for the Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. (Benson, A.)
February 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 2/19/10 ORDERING that within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, Sharon Lapin shall either (1) pay sanctions of $250.00 to the Clerk of the Court, or (2) submit a statement of good cause explaining her failure to comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1)(B).(Becknal, R)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 11/30/2009 ORDERING that dfts Bank of America Corp., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc. d/b/a America's Wholesale Lender, and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. shall have until, and including, 12/24/2009 to respond to the Complaint in this matter. (Suttles, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams et al vs Bank of America, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Williams
Represented By: Sharon L. Lapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Williams
Represented By: Sharon L. Lapin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: America's Wholesale Lender
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Capital, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anatoly Stavchansky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Wind
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?